Griffin v. Buddin et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Griffin and Leroy Anthony Griffin
Defendant: Ofc. Ohio Duke, Corp. Ms. Pressley, Lt. Mr. Courtney, Lt. Mr. Lindbury, Sgt. Rico Ravenell, Sgt. Jitt Wilson, Ofc. Laquisha Strong, Ofc. Jada Fulton, Sgt. Mrs. Reid, Lt. Moyd, Lt. Lavoia Ceasar, Sherri Buddin and Mr. Lindburg
Case Number: 4:2020cv03241
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #15 Second Proper Form Order w/NEF, (12) Summons and (5) USM-285s, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Leroy Griffin, #33202-171, BFCI, PO Box 52020, Bennettsville, SC, 29512 (dsto, )
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 11/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/19/2020. (dsto, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sherri Buddin, Lavoia Ceasar, Mr. Courtney, Ohio Duke, Jada Fulton, Mr. Lindburg, Lt. Moyd, Ms. Pressley, Rico Ravenell, Mrs. Reid, Laquisha Strong, Jitt Wilson, filed by Leroy Griffin. Service due by 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Leroy Anthony Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(dsto, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Leroy Anthony Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #7 Proper Form Order w/NEF and prisoner complaint form, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Leroy Anthony Griffin, #33202-171, FCI Bennettsville, PO Box 52020, Bennettsville, SC, 29512 (dsto, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #7 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/16/2020.(dsto)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 10/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/16/2020. (dsto, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (dsto, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Leroy Griffin. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sherri Buddin, Lavoia Ceasar, Mr. Courtney, Ohio Duke, Jada Fulton, Mr. Lindbury, Lt. Moyd, Ms. Pressley, Rico Ravenell, Mrs. Reid, Laquisha Strong, Jitt Wilson, filed by Leroy Griffin. Service due by 12/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Buddin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Anthony Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Ohio Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corp. Ms. Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Mr. Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Mr. Lindbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Rico Ravenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jitt Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Laquisha Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Jada Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Mrs. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Moyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Lavoia Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Buddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Lindburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?