Delfin v. Grandeur Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Celeste B. Delfin
Defendant: Grandeur Management, Inc. and Raja I. Younas
Case Number: 4:2020cv03651
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
2 Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Filing 62 Withdrawal of Motions: #59 First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas.. (Southern, Wesley)
May 12, 2023 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Response filed by Celeste B. Delfin.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/19/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to Defendants Interrogatories)(Mullaney, Marybeth)
April 28, 2023 Filing 59 First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Initial Interrogatories and Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit B Respective Counterparts to Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit C Correspondence to Plaintiff re Insufficient Discovery Responses)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Southern, Wesley)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/3/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/3/2023, Discovery due by 6/30/2023, Motions due by 7/14/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/25/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 9/26/2023, ADR Statement due by 7/11/2023, Mediation Due by 8/11/2023. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to September 26, 2023.Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 03/15/2023. (dsto, )
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT ORDER granting #55 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 03/15/2023.(dsto, )
January 31, 2023 Filing 55 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #49 Scheduling Order,, by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas. Response to Motion due by 2/14/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Chandler, J W)
December 23, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Alan Southern on behalf of Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas (Southern, Wesley)
November 15, 2022 Filing 52 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Celeste B. Delfin.(Mullaney, Marybeth)
October 24, 2022 Filing 50 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas.(Chandler, J W)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/24/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/9/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/3/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/3/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/3/2023, Discovery due by 3/31/2023, Motions due by 4/14/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/26/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 6/26/2023, ADR Statement due by 4/12/2023, Mediation Due by 5/12/2023. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to June 26, 2023. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/12/2022. (dsto, )
September 28, 2022 Filing 47 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Celeste B. Delfin.(Mullaney, Marybeth)
September 28, 2022 Filing 46 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Celeste B. Delfin.(Mullaney, Marybeth)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/15/2022.(dsto, )
September 13, 2022 Filing 43 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Felix Quejada Vinluan ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10697336) by Celeste B. Delfin. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Mullaney, Marybeth) (Main Document 43 and attachment replaced on 9/15/2022 with corrected documents provided by filing attorney) (dsto, )
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/31/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/14/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 9/14/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/10/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/4/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/5/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/5/2022, Discovery due by 1/30/2023, Motions due by 2/13/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/27/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/27/2023, ADR Statement due by 2/13/2023, Mediation Due by 3/13/2023. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to April 27, 2023. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/11/2022. (dsto, )
August 11, 2022 Filing 41 Case Reassigned to Judge Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell. Judge Honorable Sherri A Lydon no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
July 6, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Marybeth E Mullaney on behalf of Celeste B. Delfin (Mullaney, Marybeth)
May 23, 2022 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas re #38 Notice of Appearance (Perry, Amanda)
May 20, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L Perry on behalf of Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas (Perry, Amanda)
August 30, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas re #33 Answer to Amended Complaint (Chandler, J W)
August 30, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas.(Chandler, J W)
August 24, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas re #31 Notice of Appearance Tiffany P. Elling (Chandler, J W)
August 20, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany P Elling on behalf of Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas (Elling, Tiffany)
August 19, 2021 Filing 29 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 28 TEXT Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Celeste B. Delfin, 162-13 144th Avenue, Jamaica, NY, 11434 (dsto, )
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/19/2021.(dsto, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 27 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #25 Order on Motions w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Celeste B. Delfin, 162-13 144th Avenue, Jamaica, NY, 11434 (dsto, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas, filed by Celeste B. Delfin. Service due by 11/15/202.(dsto, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion for Extension of Time; finding as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #19 Motion to Amend/Correct. The clerk's office is directed to file the Amended Complaint, which is attached as an exhibit to Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/16/2021.(dsto, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas. Response to Motion due by 8/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Parnall, Christina)
June 11, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Emailing Standing Order 3:21-mc-331 to Celeste B. Delfin, pro se plaintiff. (suro)
June 3, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to #21 Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Response filed by Celeste B. Delfin. (dsto, )
May 20, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Response filed by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/27/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Chandler, J W)
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas. (Chandler, J W)
May 13, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Celeste B. Delfin. Response to Motion due by 5/27/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response filed by Celeste B. Delfin.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (dsto, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #16 Roseboro Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Celeste B. Delfin, 162-13 144th Avenue, Jamaica, NY, 11434 (dsto, )
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/12/2021. (dsto, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Chandler, J W)
April 2, 2021 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas.(Parnall, Christina) Modified on 4/5/2021 to add additional attachment, #1 Certificate of Service).(gnan )
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Dixon Parnall on behalf of Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas (Parnall, Christina) Modified on 4/5/2021 to add additional attachment, Modified on 4/5/2021 to additional attachment, #1 Certificate of Service) (gnan, ).
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by J W Nelson Chandler on behalf of Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas (Chandler, J W) Modified on 4/5/2021 to add additional attachment #1 Certificate of Service) (gnan ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to serve summons and complaint by Celeste B. Delfin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(swel, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #1 Complaint, #7 Order Service - Non-Inmate w/NEF, #8 Summons Issued, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Celeste B. Delfin, 162-13 144th Avenue, Jamaica, NY 11434. (prou, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas. Service due by 1/20/2021. (prou, )
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/22/2020. (prou, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Celeste B. Delfin.(dsto, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grandeur Management, Inc., Raja I. Younas (Filing fee $400 receipt number SCX300090165), filed by Celeste B. Delfin. Service due by 1/19/2021.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delfin v. Grandeur Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste B. Delfin
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Represented By: Felix Quejada Vinluan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grandeur Management, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany P Elling
Represented By: J W Nelson Chandler
Represented By: Amanda L Perry
Represented By: Christina Dixon Parnall
Represented By: Wesley Alan Southern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raja I. Younas
Represented By: J W Nelson Chandler
Represented By: Amanda L Perry
Represented By: Christina Dixon Parnall
Represented By: Tiffany P Elling
Represented By: Wesley Alan Southern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?