Wright, Worley, Pope, Ekster & Moss, PLLC v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Wright, Worley, Pope, Ekster & Moss, PLLC
Defendant: Sherry Ann Smith and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee
Case Number: 4:2021cv02222
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 8 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge(Non-Consent) placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Sherry Ann Smith 414 Red Fox Trail Newport, NC 28570. (lgib, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge pursuant to LR 73.02. Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West. (lgib, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee.(Correll, Boyd)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee.(Correll, Boyd)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sherry Ann Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lgib, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Sherry Ann Smith. Service due by 10/21/2021. (lgib, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wright, Worley, Pope, Ekster & Moss, PLLC. (lgib, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Sherry Ann Smith (filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9973022), filed by Wright, Worley, Pope, Ekster & Moss, PLLC. (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright, Worley, Pope, Ekster & Moss, PLLC v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wright, Worley, Pope, Ekster & Moss, PLLC
Represented By: Kenneth Ray Moss, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee
Represented By: Boyd Alexander Correll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?