Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina v. Howell
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Defendant: Sandra Howell
Case Number: 4:2021cv02841
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2021 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/19/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 12/3/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/13/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/7/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/9/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/29/2022, Discovery due by 4/28/2022, Motion in Limine due by 6/27/2022, Motions due by 5/12/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/6/2022, Bench Trial Deadline 7/27/2022, Mediation Due by 5/26/2022. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/30/2021. (lgib, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sandra Howell.(Oliver, Fred)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Sandra Howell.(Oliver, Fred)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. Sandra Howell waiver executed on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Waiver of Service)(Murphy, John)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sandra Howell. Service due by 12/2/2021. (lgib, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (lgib, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandra Howell (filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10052881), filed by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina v. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Represented By: John Robert Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Howell
Represented By: Fred Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?