Reaves et al v. Evans et al
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Reaves, Dmitri A Reaves, Siobhan B Reaves, Tiesha D Evans, M Reaves, Valshea Gause, Montisa Beck and Z Beck
Defendant: Wilbur O Billy Powers, Helen M Beane, Powers Properties, T J Joye, Florence County Sheriff's Office, Clemson University, Florence, County of, Horry, County of, Horry County Sheriff, Sumter, County of, Sumter County Sheriff, Richland, County of, Richland County Sheriff, York, County of, York County Sheriff, Beaufort, County of, Beaufort County Sheriff, Greenville, County of, Greenville County Sheriff, Anderson, County of, Anderson County Sheriff, Pickens, County of and Pickens County Sheriff
Case Number: 4:2021cv03188
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Florence County Sheriff's Office, Florence, County of, T J Joye. Response to Motion due by 12/1/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Kozacki, J)
November 17, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Helen M Beane, Wilbur O Billy Powers, Powers Properties re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Hofler, John)
November 17, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Helen M Beane, Wilbur O Billy Powers, Powers Properties. Response to Motion due by 12/1/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of H. Martin)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Hofler, John)
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Helen M Beane, Clemson University, Florence County Sheriff's Office, T J Joye, Wilbur O Billy Powers, Powers Properties, Florence, County of, Horry, County of, Horry County Sheriff, Sumter, County of, Sumter County Sheriff, Richland, County of, Richland County Sheriff, York, County of, York County Sheriff, Beaufort, County of, Beaufort County Sheriff, Greenville, County of, Greenville County Sheriff, Anderson, County of, Anderson County Sheriff, Pickens, County of, Pickens County Sheriff, filed by Jeremiah Reaves. Service due by 1/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 15 Text Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Dmitri A. Reaves, Jeremiah Reaves, M. Reaves, Montisa Beck, Siobhan B. Reaves, Tiesha D. Evans, Valshea Gause and Z. Beck, 6400 Carolina Beach Road, #8-63, Wilmington, NC, 28412. (prou, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: This pro se matter is subject to pre-service review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A and has not yet been approved for service as to any party. See Oct. 8, 2021 Order and Notice 10, ECF No. #8 (advising Plaintiffs that the Complaint submitted to the court are subject to dismissal, giving Plaintiffs until October 22, 2021 to correct identified deficiencies, and advising that if deficiencies are not cured it will be recommended that the matter be dismissed without service). Accordingly, the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants T.J. Joye and Florence County Sheriff's Department, ECF No. #13 , is premature and dismissed as moot. Unless and until the court issues an order permitting service of this matter no responsive pleading is required of any Defendant. Signed by Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 10/19/2021.(prou, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Formal Complaint filed by Valshea Gause. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(prou, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Florence County Sheriff's Office, T J Joye. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Writ of Ejectment, #2 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Kozacki, J)
October 10, 2021 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #8 ORDER AND NOTICE w/NEF, 9 TEXT Order w/AO-240 placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Dmitri A. Reaves, Jeremiah Reaves, M. Reaves, Montisa Beck, Siobhan B. Reaves, Tiesha D. Evans, Valshea Gause and Z. Beck, 6400 Carolina Beach Road, #8-63, Wilmington, NC, 28412 (dsto, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs are advised that each Plaintiff who has signed this multiparty complaint must complete and sign the enclosed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit (Form AO 240) and return to the court by October 22, 2021. This information and information responsive to the Order and Notice must contain the case number (C/A No.: 4:21-3188-JD-KDW) and be sent to United States District Court, (Post Office Box 2317, Florence, South Carolina 29503). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/08/2021. (dsto, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Plaintiffs may attempt to correct the defects in their Complaint by filing an amended complaint by October 22, 2021, along with any appropriate service documents. If Plaintiffs fail to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without service and without leave for further amendment. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/08/2021. (dsto, )
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Gatling Hofler, III on behalf of Helen M Beane, Wilbur O Billy Powers, Powers Properties (Hofler, John). Modified on 10/7/2021 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (prou, ).
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jeremiah Reaves. Response to Motion due by 10/14/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Helen M Beane, Clemson University, Florence County Sheriff's Office, T J Joye, Wilbur O Billy Powers, Powers Properties, filed by Valshea Gause, Siobhan B Reaves, Montisa Beck, Dmitri A Reaves, Z Beck, Tiesha D Evans, Jeremiah Reaves, M Reaves. Service due by 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves et al v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmitri A Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siobhan B Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiesha D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valshea Gause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montisa Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur O Billy Powers
Represented By: John Gatling Hofler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen M Beane
Represented By: John Gatling Hofler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powers Properties
Represented By: John Gatling Hofler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T J Joye
Represented By: J Scott Kozacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: J Scott Kozacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemson University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence, County of
Represented By: J Scott Kozacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horry, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horry County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaufort, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaufort County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickens, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickens County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?