Williams v. Town of Atlantic Beach, The
Plaintiff: Hubert Williams
Defendant: Town of Atlantic Beach, The
Case Number: 4:2021cv03439
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie Charles Sanders, Jr on behalf of Hubert Williams (Sanders, Laurie)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: #7 Scheduling Order emailed to plaintiff's counsel Jeffrey Butler at rwooda@lowcountry.com. Copy also mailed to the same at Woodard & Butler, LLC PO Box 1906 Walterboro, SC 29488 (hcic, )
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/17/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/1/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 12/1/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/26/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/25/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/28/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/28/2022, Discovery due by 5/26/2022, Motions due by 6/10/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/26/2022, ADR Statement due by 6/11/2022, Mediation Due by 7/11/2022. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to the date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 9/1/2022. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 10/28/2021. (hcic, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Town of Atlantic Beach, The.(McLean, Joseph)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Town of Atlantic Beach, The.(hcic, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-26-04436 (filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10136853), filed by Town of Atlantic Beach, The. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Town of Atlantic Beach, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Williams
Represented By: Laurie Charles Sanders, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Atlantic Beach, The
Represented By: Joseph P McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?