Burgess v. Warden
Petitioner: Darrell Burgess
Respondent: Warden Lee Correctional Institution
Case Number: 4:2021cv03667
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #13 Report and Recommendation by Darrell Burgess. Reply to Objections due by 1/5/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Envelope)(swel, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, #11 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer w/NEF, 12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Darrell Burgess, #265544, LCI, 990 Wisacky Hwy., Bishopville, SC, 29010 (dsto, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 2254 Petition in this case be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the respondent to file a return, as successive and unauthorized.IT IS SO ORDERED. Objections to R&R due by 12/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/06/2021. (dsto, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #11 Serve No-Answer Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/06/2021.(dsto, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/06/2021. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition)(dsto, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Darrell Burgess. Response to Motion due by 12/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #5 Proper Form Order w/NEF, AO240 and blank page 16 of Petition, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Darrell Burgess, #265544, LCI, 990 Wisacky Hwy., Bishopville, SC, 29010 (dsto, )
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 12/1/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 11/10/2021. (dsto, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (dsto, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Darrell Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Lee Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?