Martin v. Correct Care Recovery Solutions
Plaintiff: Anthony Shane Martin
Defendant: Correct Care Recovery Solutions, Erin Gaffney, Brian Davis, Jared Anderson, Doctor Dubie and Gina Brisson
Case Number: 4:2022cv02043
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Jared Anderson, Gina Brisson, Correct Care Recovery Solutions, Brian Davis, Doctor Dubie, Erin Gaffney. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Atkinson, Daniel)
August 23, 2022 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #11 Scheduling Order w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Anthony Shane Martin, Broad River Correctional Institution, 4546 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC, 29210 (dsto, )
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/22/2022, Discovery due by 10/24/2022, Motions due by 12/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/23/2022. (dsto, )
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY by Anthony Shane Martin to #1 Notice of Removal (Answer). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
June 30, 2022 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #6 Order to Notify of Address Change w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Anthony Shane Martin, Broad River Correctional Institution, 4546 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC, 29210 (dsto, )
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 06/30/2022. (dsto, )
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (dsto, )
June 28, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Correct Care Recovery Solutions.(dsto, )
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-40-2434. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10564496), filed by Correct Care Recovery Solutions. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Correct Care Recovery Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Shane Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Recovery Solutions
Represented By: Daniel Quintin Atkinson
Represented By: Mark V Gende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Gaffney
Represented By: Daniel Quintin Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Davis
Represented By: Daniel Quintin Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Quintin Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Dubie
Represented By: Daniel Quintin Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Brisson
Represented By: Daniel Quintin Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?