Gerald v. North Carolina Dept of Health et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Gerald
Defendant: North Carolina Dept of Health, North Carolina Vital Records, Atrium Health University Hos, Gethsemane Cemetery and Memorial and Wells Fargo
Case Number: 4:2023cv06040
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 25 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, #22 Order w/NEF, 24 Transfer of Case Management, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Kathleen Gerald, 2000 Wayside Dr, Loris, SC 29569. (prou, )
January 24, 2024 Filing 24 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Sherri A. Lydon. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: U.S. District Court, P.O. Box 2317, Florence, SC 29503. (prou, )
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to comply with a court order. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/24/2024. (prou, )
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/24/2024. (prou, )
December 27, 2023 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 17 TEXT Order on Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Kathleen Gerald, 2000 Wayside Dr., Loris, SC, 29569 (dsto, )
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, which is construed as a Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. A review of the motion reveals that Plaintiff should be relieved of the obligation to prepay the full filing fee, and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #11 , is granted. Accordingly, Plaintiff's previous Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/27/2023.(dsto, )
December 27, 2023 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #14 Order and Notice, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Kathleen Gerald, 2000 Wayside Dr., Loris, SC, 29569 (dsto, )
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE: Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in her Complaint by filing an amended complaint by January 10, 2024, along with any appropriate service documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/27/2023. (dsto, )
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Kathleen Gerald. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #8 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Form AO 240, Summons, and five USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Kathleen Gerald, 2000 Wayside Dr, Loris, SC 29569. (prou, )
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 12/21/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/30/2023. (prou, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Kathleen Gerald. Response to Motion due by 12/11/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atrium Health University Hos, Gethsemane Cemetery and Memorial, North Carolina Dept of Health, North Carolina Vital Records, Wells Fargo, filed by Kathleen Gerald. Service due by 2/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerald v. North Carolina Dept of Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Gerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Dept of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Vital Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Health University Hos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gethsemane Cemetery and Memorial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?