Orr v. Richland County et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Clay Orr
Defendant: Richland County, Alvin S. Glenn Detention Center, C.O. Madison, C.O. Pickne, Advanced Medical Provider of A.S.G.D.C., Advanced Medical and Richland County Sheriff Office
Case Number: 4:2024cv01034
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 Filing 22 Additional Attachments to Main Document #20 Objection to Report and Recommendation. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
April 10, 2024 Filing 21 Letter from Jeremy Orr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
April 10, 2024 Filing 20 Supplemental OBJECTIONS to #14 Report and Recommendation by Jeremy Clay Orr. Reply to Objections due by 4/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, ) Modified on 4/18/2024. See #22 for additional attachments. (dsto, )
April 9, 2024 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 17 TEXT Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Jeremy Clay Orr, #610735, Alvin S. Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC, 29209 (dsto, )
April 9, 2024 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER denying #16 motion for appointment of counsel. There is no right to appointed counsel in 1983 cases. While the court is granted the power to exercise its discretion to appoint counsel for an indigent in a civil action, such appointment "should be allowed only in exceptional cases." 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1); Smith v. Blackledge, 451 F.2d 1201 (4th Cir. 1971); Cook v. Bounds, 518 F.2d 779, 780 (4th Cir. 1975). Plaintiff has not demonstrated that any exceptional circumstances exist in this case. Plaintiff expresses concern that the detention center will not sign the financial forms; however, that is a moot point as his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis has already been granted. Plaintiff titles this document "objection"; however, he does not directly address the pending Report and Recommendation. Out of an abundance of caution for a pro se party, the Court will construe the document as objections as well as a motion for appointment of counsel; however, the Court will also allow Plaintiff an opportunity to supplement his objections, if he so chooses. Any supplement to Plaintiff's objections is due by April 23, 2024. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 04/09/2024.(dsto, )
April 8, 2024 Filing 16 LETTER AND MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jeremy Clay Orr. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.(dsto, ) (Main Document 16 and attachment replaced on 4/9/2024 with correct documents)
March 27, 2024 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, #13 Order - 1983 - No Service w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Jeremy Clay Orr, #610735, Alvin S. Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC, 29209 (dsto, )
March 27, 2024 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the District Court dismiss this action with prejudice under 1915(e) and 1915A and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 4/10/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 03/27/2024. (dsto, )
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 03/27/2024. (dsto, )
March 18, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advanced Medical Provider of A.S.G.D.C., Alvin S. Glenn Detention Center, C.O. Madison, C.O. Pickne, Richland County, filed by Jeremy Clay Orr. Service due by 6/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff, #2 Envelope)(dsto, )
March 14, 2024 Filing 10 Letter from Jeremy Orr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
March 7, 2024 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #7 Proper Form Order w/NEF and prisoner civil rights complaint form, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Jeremy Clay Orr, #610735, Alvin S. Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC, 29209 (dsto, )
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; per #7 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 03/07/2024.(dsto, )
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 3/28/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 03/07/2024. (dsto, )
February 29, 2024 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (dsto, )
February 29, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jeremy Clay Orr. Response to Motion due by 3/14/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
February 29, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jeremy Clay Orr. Response to Motion due by 3/15/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Supporting Document, #3 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Medical Provider of A.S.G.D.C., Alvin S. Glenn Detention Center, C.O. Madison, C.O. Pickne, Richland County, filed by Jeremy Clay Orr. Service due by 5/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. Richland County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Clay Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin S. Glenn Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Pickne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Medical Provider of A.S.G.D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County Sheriff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?