Mack v. Cotter et al
Plaintiff: Edward D Mack
Defendant: Daniel Cotter, Michael McCall, Miriam Snyder, Barrette Durrant, Robert Johnson, Lavern Epps and D Woods-Tisdale
Case Number: 5:2011cv00588
Filed: March 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge West and it is ORDERED that the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be granted. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 02/20/2013. (ahat, )
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: Defendants are ordered to update the court by December 10, 2012 with the status of their compliance with this court's July 19, 2012 order 109 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/5/2012. (mcot, )
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby directed that he has 21 days from the date of this order to provide additional argument in opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 93 , if Plaintiff so desires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/11/2012. (mcot, ) Modified on 10/11/2012 to edit text(mcot, ).
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re: 100 Motion for Order to Permit Correspondence. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request for permission to correspond with the following inmates: Marcus Rirsk, Freddie Butler, Cody Waters, Tim Daddy, Brian Sturgeon , and Vernall Ishmel. Plaintiff's communications hall be subject to the above outlined restrictions as provided by Defendants, and the SCDC personnel assigned to review Plaintiff's correspondence shall not be parties or witnesses in this m atter. As Plaintiff has not provided the names of the SCDC employees with whom he wishes to correspond, Plaintiff's request to correspond with SCDC personnel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/19/2012.(mcot, ) (Main Document 109 replaced on 7/19/2012) (mcot, ).
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 65 Motion for Sanctions; denying 66 Motion to Compel; granting 78 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/2/2012.(mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Cotter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward D Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Cotter
Represented By: James Victor McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McCall
Represented By: James Victor McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Snyder
Represented By: James Victor McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrette Durrant
Represented By: James Victor McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Johnson
Represented By: James Victor McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavern Epps
Represented By: James Victor McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Woods-Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?