Hill v. Hallman et al
Plaintiff: Douglas J Hill
Defendant: Ann Hallman, Vera Jenkins, WC McCabe, Leslie Davis, McFadden, T Nettles and Ms Monette
Case Number: 5:2012cv01428
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Dorchester
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court finds the Magistrate Judge's recommendation to be proper. Accordingly, the Report and Recommendation 51 is incorporated herein by reference and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 6/28/2013. (mcot, )
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute 42 by May 27, 2013. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/10/2013. (mcot, )
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court finds the Magistrate Judge's recommendation to be proper. Accordingly, the Report and Recommendation 19 is incorporated herein by reference and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice and without issuance and service of process as to the following Defendants: Hallman, Jenkins, McCabe, Monette, Nettles, and McFadden. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 11/13/2012. (mcot, )
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff is ordered to provide the Defendant with the approximate dates for the alleged occurrences or interactions that are the subject to Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendant Davis no later than November 30, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/7/2012.(mcot, )
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER to break-out. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/30/2012. (mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Hallman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas J Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Hallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WC McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Monette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?