Richardson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mellisa Richardson
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2013cv01846
Filed: July 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Newberry
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees (ECF No.46) pursuant to the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), be and hereby is GRANTED in the amount of $32,994.25. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/12/2016.(gnan )
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Attorney Fees under EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/19/2016.(gnan )
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation and incorporates it herein by reference to the extent it is consistent with this order. The decision of the Commissioner to deny benefits is, therefore,REVERSED and REMANDED for additional consideration. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/13/2015. (gnan )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mellisa Richardson
Represented By: Paul Townsend McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?