Cabbagestalk v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Shaheen Cabbagestalk
Defendant: Mr Fedd, Willie F Smith, All Kitchen Supervisors and Dennis Bush
Case Number: 5:2014cv00268
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Court denies Plaintiff's motion (Dkt. No. 26 ). Because Plaintiff failed to pay the Court's filing fee within the fifteen-day period following the Court's May 2, 2014 order, (Dkt. No. 23 ), the Clerk is hereby instructed to dismiss this action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/22/2014. (mcot, )
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER adopting 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaheen Cabbagestalk. Plaintiff shall have fifteen days from the date of the entry of this order to pay the C ourt's filing fee. If Plaintiff fails to pay the fee within this fifteen-day period, the Clerk shall dismiss this action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by The Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/2/2014. (hcic, )
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/9/2014. (mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabbagestalk v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Fedd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Kitchen Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaheen Cabbagestalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?