Buff v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: |
David Buff |
Defendant: |
South Carolina Department of Corrections and Bryan P Stirling |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv03022 |
Filed: |
July 29, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of South Carolina |
Office: |
Orangeburg Office |
County: |
Dorchester |
Presiding Judge: |
Kaymani D West |
Presiding Judge: |
Terry L Wooten |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 31, 2016 |
Filing
99
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is therefore ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED (Doc. # 89 ), and Plaintiff's objections are OVERRULED (Doc. # 95 ). Defendant' ;s motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED (Doc. # 71 ) and Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is hereby DENIED (Doc. # 64 ). In the alternative, the Court concludes that the issue presented has been deemed moot upon Plaintiff's release from SMU. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 3/31/2016. (mcot, )
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing
81
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 71 by September 30, 2015. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/31/2015. (mcot, )
|
April 9, 2015 |
Filing
56
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is hereby ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED. (Doc. # 50 ). For the reasons articulated by the Magistrate Judge, Defendant Stirling's motion to dismiss is GRANTED to the extent that the Complaint alleges that Defendant Stirling is liable for the actions of SCDC employees under a theory of respondeat superior. (Doc. # 23 ). The motion to dismiss is DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. (Doc. # 30 ). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 4/9/2015. (mcot, )
|
November 7, 2014 |
Filing
26
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is hereby ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED. (Doc. # 14 ). For the reasons articulated by the Magistrate Judge, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to Defendant SCDC. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 11/07/2014. (dsto, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?