Bonneau v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Elijah Bonneau
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2016cv00118
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b in the amount of $13,692.50. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 4/24/2019.(gnan )
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 24 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under EAJA, awarding $2,175.35 in attorney's fees less any amount Plaintiff owes the Government on pre-existing debts. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L. Wooten on 12/02/2016.(bshr, )
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT: This case is hereby remanded to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings. (gnan )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonneau v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Bonneau
Represented By: Beatrice E Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?