USAA General Indemnity Company v. McCullough et al
Plaintiff: USAA General Indemnity Company
Defendant: Jarok McCullough, Adrian C Chandler and Glendrella Green
Case Number: 5:2016cv03110
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Orangeburg
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AND OPINION denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/23/2018.(asni, )
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Jarok McCullough. The policy, since its inception, does not provide any coverage for outstanding claims, known or unknown, involving the 2004 Dodge Stratus, and USAA has no duty to defend or indemnify Defendant McCullough. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/27/2017.(asni, )
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Default Judgment as to defendant Adrian C. Chandler. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/26/2017.(asni, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USAA General Indemnity Company v. McCullough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: John Robert Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarok McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian C Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendrella Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?