Vann et al v. Eastman Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: Kevin R Vann and Kelli D Vann
Defendant: Eastman Chemical Company and Mundy Mainteance Services and Operations LLC
Case Number: 5:2017cv01013
Filed: April 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 JUDGMENT in favor of Eastman Chemical Company, Mundy Mainteance Services and Operations LLC against Kelli D Vann, Kevin R Vann (asni, )
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER AND OPINION denying 55 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/23/2018.(asni, )
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Non-Waiver Order Pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/6/2017.(asni, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann et al v. Eastman Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin R Vann
Represented By: Samuel Kirkpatrick Morgan, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thomas Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli D Vann
Represented By: Samuel Kirkpatrick Morgan, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thomas Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mundy Mainteance Services and Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?