Thrower v. Michelin North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Thrower
Defendant: Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Michelin North America Inc, TBC Retail Group Inc, TBC Corporation doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery, TBC Retail Group Inc doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery and Sumitomo Corporation of America doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery
Case Number: 5:2017cv02261
Filed: August 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Orangeburg
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2018 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. (Sammataro, Carmelo)
May 23, 2018 Filing 36 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 34 Reason: document not signed correctly. Corrected Filing Document Number #35 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 5/23/2018 (asni, )
May 23, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Foy Nicholson on behalf of Ralph Thrower (Nicholson, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2018 Filing 32 PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Ralph Thrower.(Crosby, Ronnie)
February 14, 2018 Filing 28 AMENDED CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/26/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/25/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/1/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/2/2018, Discovery due by 9/24/2018, Motion in Limine due by 11/30/2018, Motions due by 10/12/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/30/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 12/26/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 1/2/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/14/2018. (asni, )
February 13, 2018 Filing 27 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Ford Motor Company(Sammataro, Carmelo)
February 13, 2018 Filing 26 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo)
February 13, 2018 Filing 25 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo)
January 12, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Carmelo B Sammataro for April 16-20, 2018 (Sammataro, Carmelo)
January 10, 2018 Filing 21 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 7/2/2018, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/10/2018. (asni, )
January 10, 2018 Filing 20 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/30/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/13/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 2/13/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/26/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/25/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/25/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/25/2018, Discovery due by 6/25/2018, Motion in Limine due by 8/31/2018, Motions due by 7/9/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/31/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 9/25/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 10/2/2018, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/10/2018. (asni, )
January 10, 2018 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court to address the posture of the pending motion to dismiss or in the alternative motion for summary judgment by defendants Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation. The court observes that the parties stipulated to the dismissal of these defendants on January 9, 2018, therefore the court finds the motion to dismiss or in the alternative motion for summary judgment is moot #7 . Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/10/2018.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-02261-JMC, 5:17-cv-02262-JMC(asni, )
January 9, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation, TBC Retail Group Inc. (Goings, Robert)
November 13, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bettis Cantelou Rainsford, Jr on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Rainsford, Bettis)
September 20, 2017 Filing 15 STIPULATED SHARING AND NON-SHARING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/20/2017. (asni, )
September 18, 2017 Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA INC. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/18/2017. (asni, )
September 6, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Orangeburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Removal)(Sammataro, Carmelo)
September 4, 2017 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment. First attachment description: Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for SummaryJudgment . (Gooding, Jessica)
August 29, 2017 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ralph Thrower.(Crosby, Ronnie)
August 25, 2017 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation, TBC Retail Group Inc.(Goings, Robert)
August 25, 2017 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo)
August 25, 2017 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation, TBC Retail Group Inc.(Goings, Robert)
August 24, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternate MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Response to Motion due by 9/7/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation. (originally filed in state court) No proposed order.(asni, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2017: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Shinichi Kato, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Megan Filoon) (asni, ). additional attachment entry #9 added on 9/5/2017 (asni, ).
August 24, 2017 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company.(asni, )
August 24, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg County, case number 2017-CP-38-00374. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7325696), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit B - Aug. 23, 2017 email, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrower v. Michelin North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Corporation of America
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Carmelo B Sammataro
Represented By: Joseph Kenneth Carter, Jr
Represented By: Bettis Cantelou Rainsford, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin North America Inc
Represented By: A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr
Represented By: Crystal M McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Retail Group Inc
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Corporation doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Retail Group Inc doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Corporation of America doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Thrower
Represented By: Austin Howell Crosby
Represented By: Ronnie L Crosby
Represented By: Alexander Blair Cash
Represented By: Elizabeth Foy Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?