Thrower v. Michelin North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Thrower
Defendant: Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Michelin North America Inc, TBC Retail Group Inc, TBC Corporation doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery, TBC Retail Group Inc doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery and Sumitomo Corporation of America doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery
Case Number: 5:2017cv02262
Filed: August 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Orangeburg
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH FORD MOTOR COMPANY; granting #43 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/14/2018.(asni, )
June 1, 2018 Filing 48 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable J Michelle Childs: Motion Hearing held on 6/1/2018 re #43 MOTION for Settlement filed by Ralph Thrower. Written order forthcoming. Court Reporter Kathleen Richardson. (mbro, )
May 23, 2018 Filing 47 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 45 Reason: document not signed correctly. Corrected Filing Document Number #46 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 5/23/2018 (asni, )
May 23, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Foy Nicholson on behalf of Ralph Thrower (Nicholson, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #43 MOTION for Settlement : Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2018 02:00 PM in Columbia # 3, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable J Michelle Childs. (asni, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Settlement by Ralph Thrower. Response to Motion due by 6/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cash, Alexander)
April 25, 2018 Filing 41 PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Ralph Thrower.(Crosby, Ronnie)
February 14, 2018 Filing 37 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/26/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/25/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/1/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/2/2018, Discovery due by 9/24/2018, Motion in Limine due by 11/30/2018, Motions due by 10/12/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/30/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 12/26/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 1/2/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/14/2018. (asni, )
February 13, 2018 Filing 36 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Ford Motor Company(Sammataro, Carmelo)
February 13, 2018 Filing 35 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo)
February 13, 2018 Filing 34 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo)
January 12, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Carmelo B Sammataro for April 16-20, 2018 (Sammataro, Carmelo)
January 10, 2018 Filing 30 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 7/2/2018, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/10/2018. (asni, )
January 10, 2018 Filing 29 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/30/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/13/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 2/13/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/26/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/25/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/25/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/25/2018, Discovery due by 6/25/2018, Motion in Limine due by 8/31/2018, Motions due by 7/9/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/31/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 9/25/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 10/2/2018, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/10/2018. (asni, )
January 10, 2018 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court to address the posture of the pending motion to dismiss or in the alternative motion for summary judgment by defendants Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation. The court observes that the parties stipulated to the dismissal of these defendants on January 9, 2018, therefore the court finds the motion to dismiss or in the alternative motion for summary judgment is moot #7 . Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 1/10/2018.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-02261-JMC, 5:17-cv-02262-JMC(asni, )
January 9, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation, TBC Retail Group Inc. (Goings, Robert)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH TBC RETAIL GROUP, INC. D/B/A NTB-NATIONALTIRE AND BATTERY, TBC CORPORATION D/B/A NTB-NATIONAL TIRE AND BATTERY, AND SUMITOMO CORPORATION OF AMERICA D/B/A NTB-NATIONAL TIRE AND BATTERY; granting #21 Motion for Settlement.(asni, )
November 14, 2017 Filing 24 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable J Michelle Childs: Settlement Conference held on 11/14/2017. Court approves settlement. Written order forthcoming. Court Reporter Carly Horenkamp. (mbro, )
November 13, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Bettis Cantelou Rainsford, Jr on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Rainsford, Bettis)
November 7, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #21 MOTION for Settlement with TBC Retail Group, Inc. dba NTB-National Tire and Battery : Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2017 10:00 AM in Columbia # 3, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable J Michelle Childs. (asni, )
November 2, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Settlement with TBC Retail Group, Inc. dba NTB-National Tire and Battery by Ralph Thrower. Response to Motion due by 11/16/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cash, Alexander)
October 10, 2017 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/10/2017.(asni, )
September 25, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Gordon Sproule, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7375878)( Response to Motion due by 10/10/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert Gordon Sproule, Jr.)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Sammataro, Carmelo) Modified to remove motion relief selected in error on 9/25/2017 (asni, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2017: #2 certificate of good standing (supreme court of alabama)) (asni, ).
September 20, 2017 Filing 18 STIPULATED SHARING AND NON-SHARING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/20/2017. (asni, ) (Main Document 18 replaced on 9/20/2017) (asni, ).
September 18, 2017 Filing 17 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable J Michelle Childs: Settlement Conference held on 9/18/2017. Settlement approved. Court Reporter Gigi Simcox. (mbro, )
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA INC. granting #11 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/18/2017.(asni, )
September 8, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #11 MOTION for Approval of Settlement : Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2017 10:00 AM in Columbia # 3, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable J Michelle Childs. (asni, )
September 7, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Verified Petition for Approval of Settlement with Michelin North America, Inc. (Wrongful Death and Survival Action) by Ralph Thrower. Response to Motion due by 9/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cash, Alexander)
September 6, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Orangeburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Removal)(Sammataro, Carmelo)
September 4, 2017 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment. First attachment description: Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for SummaryJudgment . (Gooding, Jessica)
August 29, 2017 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ralph Thrower.(Crosby, Ronnie)
August 25, 2017 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation, TBC Retail Group Inc.(Goings, Robert)
August 25, 2017 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Sammataro, Carmelo)
August 25, 2017 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation, TBC Retail Group Inc.(Goings, Robert)
August 24, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Response to Motion due by 9/7/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Sumitomo Corporation of America, TBC Corporation. (originally filed in state court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit Shinichi Kato, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Megan Filoon)No proposed order.(asni, ) additional attachment entry #9 added on 9/5/2017 (asni, ).
August 24, 2017 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company.(asni, )
August 24, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg County, case number 2017-CP-38-00375. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7325726), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit B - Aug. 23, 2017 email, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrower v. Michelin North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Corporation of America
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Bettis Cantelou Rainsford, Jr
Represented By: Carmelo B Sammataro
Represented By: Joseph Kenneth Carter, Jr
Represented By: Robert Gordon Sproule, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin North America Inc
Represented By: A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr
Represented By: Crystal M McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Retail Group Inc
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Corporation doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBC Retail Group Inc doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Corporation of America doing business as NTB National Tire and Battery
Represented By: Robert Fredrick Goings
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Thrower
Represented By: Alexander Blair Cash
Represented By: Austin Howell Crosby
Represented By: Elizabeth Foy Nicholson
Represented By: Ronnie L Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?