Drain v. Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four et al

Plaintiff: Pamela Drain
Defendant: Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four and South Carolina Department of Education
Case Number: 5:2018cv03267
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Ashley Cole Story for 06/24/19 - 07/10/19 (Story, Ashley)
January 25, 2019 Filing 35 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 34 Reason: Per request of e-filing attorney. Document to be corrected and refiled. (cbru, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 33 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Pamela Drain.(Williams, Virginia)
January 22, 2019 Filing 32 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four.(Story, Ashley) Modified to edit text on 1/23/2019 (cbru, ).
January 22, 2019 Filing 31 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four.(Story, Ashley)
January 22, 2019 Filing 30 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four.(Story, Ashley)
January 22, 2019 Filing 29 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Education.(Jett, Norma A)
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by South Carolina Department of Education. (Jett, Norma A)
January 7, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Pamela Drain. (Williams, Virginia)
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pamela Drain.(Williams, Virginia)
December 31, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/7/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Excerpts of Dr. Sarah Y. Vinson, #2 Deposition Excerpts of Nurse Sharon Smoak, #3 Deposition Excerpts of Emma Walker, #4 Nolan v. Sunstate Carriers, Inc., #5 Casto v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, #6 November 14, 2018, Email Correspondence re Answer Extension, #7 Electronic Notice of Removal, #8 Notice of Removal to All Counsels)(Story, Ashley) Modified to edit text on 1/2/2019 (cbru, ).
December 21, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by South Carolina Department of Education.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/28/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 unpublished decision)(Jett, Norma A) Modified to edit text on 1/2/2019 (cbru, ).
December 21, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Pamela Drain. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Consent Scheduling Order, #4 Exhibit C - Case actions, #5 Exhibit D - Motion to Amend, #6 Exhibit E - Order - Compel, #7 Exhibit F - Email 12 04 18, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit H - Notice 10 10 18, #10 Exhibit I - Order to Amend, #11 Exhibit J - email re answer, #12 Exhibit K - McElroy case)No proposed order.(Williams, Virginia) Modified to correct motion relief on 12/21/2018 (cbru, ). (Modified to replace memo in support with corrected document provided by filing user and to edit exhibit descriptions on 12/28/2018 (jpet, ).
December 20, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 1/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/3/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/3/2019, Discovery due by 6/3/2019, Motion in Limine due by 9/13/2019, Motions due by 6/17/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/3/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 10/4/2019, Mediation Due by 8/16/2019) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/20/2018. (cbru, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Scheduling Order,, by Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Story, Ashley) (Main Document 21 replaced on 12/20/2018) (cbru, ). Modified to edit text on 12/20/2018 (cbru, ).
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than January 3, 2019. (cbru, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four. (Williams, Lonnesse)
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint by South Carolina Department of Education. (Jett, Norma A) Modified to edit text on 12/12/2018 (cbru, ).
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four.(Story, Ashley)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal,. First attachment description: Form 4 Order denying SJ motion . (Jett, Norma A)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than December 27, 2018. (cbru, ) Modified to edit text on 12/11/2018 (cbru, ).
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four. (Williams, Lonnesse) Modified to edit text on 12/11/2018 (cbru, ).
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Amended Complaint by South Carolina Department of Education.(Jett, Norma A)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/6/2018. (cbru, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 1/10/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/3/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/3/2019, Discovery due by 6/3/2019, Motion in Limine due by 9/13/2019, Motions due by 6/17/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/3/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 10/4/2019, Mediation Due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/6/2018. (cbru, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by South Carolina Department of Education re 6 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal, #7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories (cbru, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Education.(cbru, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 *Originally filed in state court* MOTION for independent medical examination by Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four. No proposed order.(cbru, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 *Originally filed in state court* MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by South Carolina Department of Education. No proposed order.(cbru, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 *Originally filed in state court* MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pamela Drain. Modified to delete erroneous attachment on 12/6/2018 (cbru, ).
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 *Originally filed in state court* MOTION for Summary Judgment by South Carolina Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Coversheet, #2 Memo in Support, #3 Supporting Documents, #4 Supplemental Memo in Support, #5 Supporting Documents)No proposed order.(cbru, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2016-CP-38-01131 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8141892) filed by South Carolina Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents (part 1), #2 State Court Documents (part 2), #3 State Court Documents (part 3), #4 Notice of Filing Removal)(cbru, ) Additional attachment filed as entry #15 on 12/11/2018 (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drain v. Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orangeburg Consolidated School District Four
Represented By: Andrea E White
Represented By: Lonnesse Patrice Williams
Represented By: William C Freeman
Represented By: Ashley Cole Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Education
Represented By: Norma A Turner Jett
Represented By: Allison Dennis Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Drain
Represented By: David Reynolds Williams
Represented By: Fernando Xavier Starkes
Represented By: Virginia Watson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?