Walker v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Wayne Walker
Defendant: Major Anderson and Captain Wells
Case Number: 5:2019cv01824
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 28 USM-285 Returned Executed. Major Anderson served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (prou, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 27 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 26 TEXT Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Jeffery Wayne Walker, #348355, CCDC, 315 E. Meadow Street, Gaffney, SC, 29340 (dsto, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Jeffrey Wayne Walker filed a Motion to Appoint Counsel on July 22, 2019. ECF No. #25 . Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied. There is no right to appointed counsel in a 1983 case. See Hardwick v. Ault, 517 F.2d 295 (5th Cir. 1975). Although the court has discretion to appoint counsel for an indigent in a civil action, 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1); Smith v. Blackledge, 451 F.2d 1201 (4th Cir. 1971), such appointment "should be allowed only in exceptional cases." Cook v. Bounds, 518 F.2d 779, 780 (4th Cir. 1975). The existence of exceptional circumstances "will turn on the quality of two basic factors - the type and complexity of the case, and the abilities of the individuals bringing it." Brock v. City of Richmond, 983 F.2d 1055 (4th Cir. 1993) (unpublished table decision) (quoting Whisenant v. Yaum, 739 F.2d 160, 163 (4th Cir. 1984)). The undersigned finds this case is not an exceptional circumstance warranting appointment of counsel, and Plaintiff has competently represented himself. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 07/24/2019.(dsto, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jeffery Wayne Walker. Response to Motion due by 8/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(dsto, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 20 Text Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 22 Text Order on Motion to Order Cherokee County Detention Center's Mailroom to Release Copy of Mail Log, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Jeffery Wayne Walker, #348355, Cherokee County Detention Center, 315 E Meadow Street, Gaffney, SC 29340. (prou, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff filed a motion to order Cherokee County Detention Center to produce documents. ECF No. #17 . This motion is denied as premature at this time, with leave to re-file if Defendants do not provide the requested documents after they have been properly served and a scheduling order has been entered that allows discovery pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/10/2019.(prou, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the Court for consideration of Plaintiff's Motions to Amend/Correct Complaint, ECF Nos. #16 and #18 , filed by Plaintiff, on July 8, 2019, while the Complaint was pending service on Defendant Major Andersson. ECF Nos. 11 , #12 . Plaintiff's Motions to Amend/Correct Complaint, ECF Nos. #16 , #18 , are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to attach Plaintiff's motions, ECF Nos. #16 , #18 , as exhibits to the Complaint. The Clerk is also directed to add Captain Wells as a Defendant in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/10/2019.(prou, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Jeffery Wayne Walker. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Order Cherokee County Detention Center's Mailroom to Release Copy of Mail Log by Jeffery Wayne Walker. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend Relief Sought re: #1 Complaint by Jeffery Wayne Walker. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #10 Order 1983 w/NEF, 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Jeffery Wayne Walker, #348355, Cherokee County Detention Center, 315 E Meadow Street, Gaffney, SC 29340. (prou, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Major Anderson. Service due by 9/26/2019. (prou, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #10 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/28/2019.(prou, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/28/2019. (prou, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Spartanburg. (prou, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jeffery Wayne Walker. Response to Motion due by 7/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Major Anderson, filed by Jeffery Wayne Walker. Service due by 9/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #2 Supplemental Pleading, #3 Supplemental Pleading) (prou, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Wayne Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?