Jackson v. Voorhees College
Plaintiff: Melika S. Jackson
Defendant: Voorhees College
Case Number: 5:2019cv01912
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/29/2019. (bgoo)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Voorhees College. Response to Motion due by 9/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Evert, Jill)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 DISCOVERY REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Voorhees College.(Evert, Jill)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Voorhees College.(Evert, Jill)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 9/4/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/29/2019, Discovery due by 2/26/2020, Motions due by 3/12/2020, Mediation Due by 5/11/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 8/1/2019. (bgoo)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Voorhees College.(Evert, Jill) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/1/2019 with corrected document provided by filing user.) (bgoo)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Voorhees College.(Evert, Jill) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/1/2019 with corrected document provided by filing user.) (bgoo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Melika S. Jackson.(Babb, Julius)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting with consent #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/11/2019. (kkus, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Voorhees College. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Foster, William)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett. Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill April Evert on behalf of Voorhees College (Evert, Jill)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Voorhees College. (lbak)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Bamberg Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-05-00134. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8540576), filed by Voorhees College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal to State Court) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Voorhees College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voorhees College
Represented By: William H Foster, III
Represented By: Jill April Evert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melika S. Jackson
Represented By: Julius Wistar Babb, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?