Washington v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kristine Washington
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 5:2019cv02056
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Acknowledgment of Service on the Commissioner of Social Security by Kristine Washington. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Service)(Oxner, Harry)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristine Washington. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Service)(Oxner, Harry)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristine Washington. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 8/6/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card)(Oxner, Harry)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 7 Reason: Incorrect filing, to be refiled by filing user. (gnan )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/27/2019. (gnan )
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kristine Washington. (Oxner, Harry) (Modified on 7/23/2019 to add case number to document). (gnan ).
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 10/21/2019.(gnan )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8571779.) Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Kristine Washington. Service due by 10/21/2019.(gnan )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Washington
Represented By: Harry A Oxner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?