Hutton v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Hutton
Defendant: Unknown John Doe and Brandon Pinion
Case Number: 5:2019cv02284
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #12 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Christopher Hutton, #36927037, FCI, PO Box 52020, Bennettsville, SC, 29512. (prou, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court ACCEPTS the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. #8 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/24/2019. (prou, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Christopher Hutton, #36927037, FCI, PO Box 52020, Bennettsville, SC, 29512 (dsto, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana for further handling. Based on this recommended disposition, the undersigned has not undertaken further proper-form review.IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 08/15/2019. (dsto, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (prou, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe(No. 2), John Doe(Jailer), Brandon Pinion, filed by Christopher Hutton. Service due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Regional Administrative Remedy Appeal, #2 Letter from Christopher Hutton, #3 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutton v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Pinion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?