Cooper v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Cooper, Jr.
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv02466
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union, LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Trans Union, LLC(Johnson, Wilbur)
October 10, 2019 Filing 22 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Experian Information Solutions Inc(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by James Cooper, Jr.(Maxfield, David)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by James Cooper, Jr(Maxfield, David)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/20/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/28/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/4/2020, Discovery due by 6/29/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/10/2020, Motions due by 6/29/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/10/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/11/2020, Mediation Due by 3/5/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/10/2019. (asni, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by James Cooper, Jr. (Attachments: #1 26f Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxfield, David)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Barker, Rita)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Barker, Rita)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/7/2019. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/9/2019.(asni, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 2/27/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/6/2019. (asni, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/26/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/10/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/10/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/20/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/20/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/21/2020, Discovery due by 2/20/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/1/2020, Motions due by 3/5/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/2/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/6/2019. (asni, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trans Union, LLC answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/3/2019.(asni, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Trans Union, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Johnson, Wilbur)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Cooper, Jr.(Maxfield, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union, LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(mbro, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas, First Judicial Circuit, State of South Carolina, County of Orangeburg, case number 2019-CP-38-01031. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8645128), filed by Trans Union, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(mbro, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cooper, Jr.
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?