Tarashuk v. Orangeburg County et al
Plaintiff: Paul Tarashuk
Defendant: Orangeburg County Emergency Medical Services, Danny Rivers, Jamie D Givens, Keith A Cline, Leroy Ravenell, Santee, The Town of, Santee Police Department, The, Orangeburg County, South Carolina Department of Public Safety, The, Alison KB Harmon, Fred D Rice, Buist M Smith, Leroy Smith, Joseph Serrano, Clifford A Doroski and Orangeburg County Sheriff's Office, The
Case Number: 5:2019cv02495
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by G Wade Cooper on behalf of Alison KB Harmon (Cooper, G)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren K Sanders on behalf of Alison KB Harmon (Sanders, Darren)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Paul Tarashuk. Alison KB Harmon served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Burke, Russell)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Fred D Rice, Leroy Smith, South Carolina Department of Public Safety, The(Hood, Allison)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/24/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/27/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/22/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/24/2020, Discovery due by 6/26/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/31/2020, Motions due by 7/10/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/31/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/31/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/16/2019. (asni, ) Modified to edit docket text on 10/16/2019 (asni, ).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Clifford A Doroski, Orangeburg County Sheriff's Office, The, Leroy Ravenell(Wlodarczyk, Damon)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Clifford A Doroski, Orangeburg County Sheriff's Office, The, Leroy Ravenell.(Wlodarczyk, Damon)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Paul Tarashuk.(Burke, Russell)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Paul Tarashuk(Burke, Russell)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Keith A Cline, Santee Police Department, The, Santee, The Town of, Joseph Serrano, Buist M Smith(Frawley, Patrick)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Keith A Cline, Santee Police Department, The, Santee, The Town of, Joseph Serrano, Buist M Smith.(Frawley, Patrick)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint All Parties Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Santee Police Department, The, Santee, The Town of, Joseph Serrano, Buist M Smith.(Frawley, Patrick)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Santee Police Department, The, Santee, The Town of, Joseph Serrano, Buist M Smith, Leroy Smith.(Frawley, Patrick)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fred D Rice, Leroy Smith, South Carolina Department of Public Safety, The.(Hood, Allison)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Riddle on behalf of Jamie D Givens, Orangeburg County, Orangeburg County Emergency Medical Services, Danny Rivers (Riddle, Jonathan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Jamie D Givens, Orangeburg County, Orangeburg County Emergency Medical Services, Danny Rivers.(Davidson, William)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Clifford A Doroski, Orangeburg County Sheriff's Office, The, Leroy Ravenell.(Wlodarczyk, Damon)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Paul Tarashuk.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/2/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Burke, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fred D Rice, Leroy Smith, South Carolina Department of Public Safety, The.(Hood, Allison)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Fred D Rice, Leroy Smith, South Carolina Department of Public Safety, The.(Hood, Allison)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Paul Tarashuk.(Burke, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Santee Police Department, The, Santee, The Town of. Response to Motion due by 9/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Frawley, Patrick)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Clifford A Doroski, Orangeburg County Sheriff's Office, The, Leroy Ravenell.(Wlodarczyk, Damon)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Santee, The Town of. refiled by the clerk to correct event type.(asni, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Keith A Cline, Buist M Smith. refiled by the clerk to correct event type.(asni, ) Modified to correct document number on 9/10/2019 (asni, ).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joseph Serrano. refiled by the clerk to correct event type.(asni, ) Modified to correct document number on 9/10/2019 (asni, ).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Keith A Cline, Buist M Smith.(Frawley, Patrick)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Serrano.(Frawley, Patrick)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 3/2/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/10/2019. (asni, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/30/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/25/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/24/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/24/2020, Discovery due by 2/24/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/1/2020, Motions due by 3/9/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/2/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/10/2019. (asni, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Santee, The Town of.(Frawley, Patrick)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Santee, The Town of. (asni, ) Modified to remove filing users on 9/6/2019 (asni, ).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg County, case number 2019-CP-38-01037. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8651391), filed by Santee, The Town of. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Removal of SC Department of Public Safety, Leroy Smith and Fred D. Rice, #2 Consent to Removal of The Orangeburg County Sheriffs Office, Leroy Revenell, and Clifford A. Doroski, #3 Consent to Removal of Orangeburg County, Orangeburg County Emergency Medical Services, Danny Rivers, and Jamie D. Givens, #4 Consent to Removal of The Santee Police Department, Joseph Serrano, Buist M. Smith and Keith A. Cline, #5 State Court Documents, #6 Affidavit of Norma A.T. Jett, #7 Affidavit of Damon C. Wlodarczyk, #8 Affidavit of William H. Davidson, II, #9 Affidavit of Patirck J. Frawley)(asni, ) Modified to remove filing users on 9/6/2019 (asni, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarashuk v. Orangeburg County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orangeburg County Emergency Medical Services
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Rivers
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie D Givens
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith A Cline
Represented By: Evan Markus Gessner
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Ravenell
Represented By: Damon C Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santee, The Town of
Represented By: Evan Markus Gessner
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santee Police Department, The
Represented By: Evan Markus Gessner
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orangeburg County
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Public Safety, The
Represented By: Norma A Turner Jett
Represented By: Allison Dennis Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison KB Harmon
Represented By: G Wade Cooper
Represented By: Darren K Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred D Rice
Represented By: Norma A Turner Jett
Represented By: Allison Dennis Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buist M Smith
Represented By: Evan Markus Gessner
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Smith
Represented By: Norma A Turner Jett
Represented By: Allison Dennis Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Serrano
Represented By: Evan Markus Gessner
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford A Doroski
Represented By: Damon C Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orangeburg County Sheriff's Office, The
Represented By: Damon C Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Tarashuk
Represented By: Russell Thomas Burke
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?