Burris v. South Carolina State University
Plaintiff: Sandra Burris
Defendant: South Carolina State University
Case Number: 5:2020cv01091
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by South Carolina State University.(Mazyck, Dwayne)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER Entry #5 Reason: refiled to correct filing error. Corrected Filing Document Number #6 . (dsto, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Sandra Burris. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(Englebardt, Eric) Modified on 4/10/2020 to correct filing date and main Document 6 replaced with document provided by filing user to correct signature. (dsto)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to South Carolina State University. Service due by 6/17/2020. (dsto, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sandra Burris.(dsto, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against South Carolina State University (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9008356), filed by Sandra Burris. Service due by 6/16/2020.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burris v. South Carolina State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina State University
Represented By: Dwayne T Mazyck
Represented By: Susan M Fittipaldi
Represented By: Thomas Kennedy Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Burris
Represented By: Eric K Englebardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?