Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Hill et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Clarence Hill, Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Clarence W Hill
Case Number: 5:2020cv01271
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Chambers, Michael)
May 15, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/22/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Wray, Ronald)
May 14, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Wray, Ronald)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER Granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to #14 Response in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim and lacks subject matter jurisdiction, filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. ( Reply due by 5/14/2020.) Directed Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 5/4/20. (mflo, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Response to Motion due by 5/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Chambers, Michael)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Response to Motion due by 5/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Wray, Ronald)
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/7/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plat of 0.39 Acre)(Chambers, Michael)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.(Chambers, Michael)
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #3 MOTION to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 4/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 4/22/20.(mflo, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Response to Motion due by 5/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Chambers, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company; re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, ( Response to Motion and plaintiff's 26.01 due by 4/23/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ), Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 4/15/20. (mflo, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Response to Motion due by 4/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Chambers, Michael)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than April 16, 2020. re #1 Notice of Removal. (mflo, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Orangeburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Acknowledgment of State Clerk of Court)(Wray, Ronald)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim and lacks subject matter jurisdiction by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Response to Motion due by 4/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(mflo, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2014-CP-38-678. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9033907), filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Documents Amended Summons and Complaint)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Ronald K Wray, II
Represented By: James Andrew Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence W Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Sean Matthew Foerster
Represented By: Michael Stephen Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?