Pandya et al v. Cuccinelli
Plaintiff: Purvi Pravinkumar Joshi and Hirenkumar Govindlal Pandya
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 5:2020cv01541
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted by Kenneth Cuccinelli. Response to Motion due by 7/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FOIA Email, #2 Exhibit FOIA Email, #3 Exhibit Declaration)No proposed order.(Edgerton, Jacqueline)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of South Carolina by Hirenkumar Govindlal Pandya, Purvi Pravinkumar Joshi. Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service)(Banias, Bradley)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Purvi Pravinkumar Joshi, Hirenkumar Govindlal Pandya.(asni, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (asni, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Cuccinelli ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9064350.), filed by Hirenkumar Govindlal Pandya, Purvi Pravinkumar Joshi. Service due by 7/21/2020(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pandya et al v. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Jacqueline LaPan Edgerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purvi Pravinkumar Joshi
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hirenkumar Govindlal Pandya
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?