Lothridge v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Grady L Lothridge, Jr
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 5:2020cv02110
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grady L Lothridge, Jr. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 6/8/2020, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Certified Mail Receipts)(Clardy, Timothy)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/5/2020.(prou, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (prou, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Grady L Lothridge, Jr. Response to Motion due by 6/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Grady L Lothridge, Jr. Service due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Limited Power of Attorney)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lothridge v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady L Lothridge, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Allen Clardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?