Goldwire v. Warden FCI Bennettsville
Petitioner: Shafeeq Ali Goldwire
Respondent: Warden FCI Bennettsville
Case Number: 5:2020cv02659
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 17 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Shafeeq Ali Goldwire, #53956-004, FCI Bennettsville, PO Box 52020, Bennettsville, SC 29512. (prou, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The response to the Petition is now due November 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/4/2020.(prou, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Warden FCI Bennettsville. Response to Motion due by 9/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Daley, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #12 Order 2241 Federal Habeas, placed in U.S. Mail via certified mail (article #7014 0150 0000 5030 8244) from Florence Clerk's Office to Attorney General of the US, Dept. Of Justice, Room B-103, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Washington, DC 20530-001. (prou, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #12 Order 2241 Federal Habeas w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Shafeeq Ali Goldwire, #53956-004, FCI Bennettsville, PO Box 52020, Bennettsville, SC 29512. (prou, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk. Directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(prou, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SCX300088645 (dsto, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (prou, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shafeeq Ali Goldwire. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldwire v. Warden FCI Bennettsville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden FCI Bennettsville
Represented By: Robert F Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shafeeq Ali Goldwire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?