Austin v. Orangeburg Homes LLC
Plaintiff: Margaret Austin
Defendant: Orangeburg Homes LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv03406
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Orangeburg Homes LLC.(Dixon, Harry)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Orangeburg Homes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Dixon, Harry)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Orangeburg Homes LLC.(Dixon, Harry)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY: Rule 16 conference held before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on November 10, 2020, at 10:00 AM. Parties are working well together towards a resolution of the case. They had a Rule 26(f) conference and will file the 26(f) report and the amended scheduling order. (lgib, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Margaret Austin.(Keitt, Lawrence)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY by Margaret Austin to #4 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keitt, Lawrence)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 Telephone Conference on 11/10/2020 10:00 AM before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon. Defendant's counsel is to initiate the call and have all parties on the line before calling the Court at (843) 292-5650. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/7/2020. (lgib, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/28/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 11/4/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/15/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/8/2021, Discovery due by 4/5/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/4/2021, Motions due by 4/19/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/14/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2021, Mediation Due by 5/3/2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 10/7/2020. (lgib, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Margaret Austin by Orangeburg Homes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 2017 Rule to Vacate Action, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Loss)(Dixon, Harry)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Orangeburg Homes LLC. (lgib, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-38-00846 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9367127), filed by Orangeburg Homes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Citizenship of Defendant) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Orangeburg Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Austin
Represented By: Lawrence Keitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orangeburg Homes LLC
Represented By: Harry Alwyn Dixon
Represented By: Demetri K Koutrakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?