Hollins v. West et al
Plaintiff: Kerry Hollins
Defendant: Robert Bullard, Jeanise Singleton, Archie Sanderson, Kennethia C Freeman, Charles West, Sharmain Y Brown, John Rodgers, Jr and Michael T Watson
Case Number: 5:2020cv04317
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert Bullard.(Plyler, Daniel)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kerry Hollins. Sharmain Y Brown served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021; Kennethia C Freeman served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021; John Rodgers, Jr served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021; Archie Sanderson served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021; Jeanise Singleton served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021; Michael T Watson served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Elliott, Charles)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kerry Hollins. Robert Bullard served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(Elliott, Charles)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/2/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/1/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 3/1/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/29/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/23/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/24/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/14/2021, Discovery due by 7/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 9/10/2021, Motions due by 7/26/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/20/2021, Mediation Due by 8/9/2021. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs 7 days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after October 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/13/2021. (prou, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sharmain Y Brown, Kennethia C Freeman, John Rodgers, Jr, Archie Sanderson, Jeanise Singleton, Michael T Watson.(Plyler, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sharmain Y Brown, Kennethia C Freeman, John Rodgers, Jr, Archie Sanderson, Jeanise Singleton, Michael T Watson.(Plyler, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sharmain Y Brown, Robert Bullard, Kennethia C Freeman, John Rodgers, Jr, Archie Sanderson, Jeanise Singleton, Michael T Watson, Charles West. (prou, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kerry Hollins.(prou, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sharmain Y Brown, Robert Bullard, Kennethia C Freeman, John Rodgers, Jr, Archie Sanderson, Jeanise Singleton, Michael T Watson, Charles West ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9530497.), filed by Kerry Hollins. Service due by 3/15/2021.(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollins v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bullard
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanise Singleton
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archie Sanderson
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennethia C Freeman
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharmain Y Brown
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rodgers, Jr
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T Watson
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Hollins
Represented By: Charles Carter Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?