Ravi Avi, LLC v. Renaud
Plaintiff: Ravi Avi, LLC
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Case Number: 5:2021cv01930
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ravi Avi, LLC. Tracy Renaud served on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt)(Banias, Bradley)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tracy Renaud. (U.S. Attorney) (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General, #2 United States Citizenship and Immigration Services)(cbru, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ravi Avi, LLC.(cbru, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tracy Renaud (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9928094) filed by Ravi Avi, LLC. Service due by 9/27/2021(cbru, ) Modified to correct filing date on 6/29/2021 (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravi Avi, LLC v. Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravi Avi, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?