Henderson v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Johnnie Henderson
Defendant: United States of America and Ofc Craig Snyder
Case Number: 5:2021cv03249
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Johnnie Henderson. Affidavit of Service for Defendant Craig Snyder Craig Snyder served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Slocum, Lauren)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnnie Henderson. United States of America served on 10/14/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Slocum, Lauren)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Craig Snyder. (prou, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (prou, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnnie Henderson.(prou, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craig Snyder, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10110860.), filed by Johnnie Henderson. Service due by 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receipt of Claim, #2 Exhibit B - Final Denial of Claim)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Henderson
Represented By: Charles Carter Elliott, Jr
Represented By: Lauren Knight Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc Craig Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?