Walker v. Lexington County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Wayne Walker
Defendant: Lexington County Detention Center, Wellpath, Dr Jose J Chavez, Lexington County, Nurse Practitioner Beth Rouse, V Bookman, Correctional Officer Novak (or Novac) and Sgt O Thomas
Case Number: 5:2021cv03624
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 24 Second Letter from Bradley Wayne Walker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Default Judgment by Bradley Wayne Walker. Response to Motion due by 1/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(dsto, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION For No Contact Order by Bradley Wayne Walker. Response to Motion due by 1/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(dsto, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Bradley Wayne Walker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 20 Letter from Bradley Walker. Re: would like to file a no contact order on the following jail staff: Dr Jose Chavez; Nurse Practitioner Beth Rouse; Sgt O. Thomas; Correctional Officer Novak and V. Bookman, Classification Correctional Officer (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(swel, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 19 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Letter from Bradley Walker. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 16 Text Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Bradley Wayne Walker, #361377, Lexington County Detention Center, 521 Gibson Road, Lexington, SC 29072. (prou, )
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the Court for consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. ECF No. #15 . Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, ECF No. #15 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to attach Plaintiff's motion, ECF No. #15 , as exhibits to the complaint. The Clerk is also directed to add Lexington County; Nurse Practitioner Beth Rouse; V. Bookman, classification correctional officer; correctional officer Novak (or Novac); and Sgt. O. Thomas as Defendants in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/7/2021.(prou, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Bradley Wayne Walker. Response to Motion due by 12/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Changes to Complaint, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #9 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Summons, and two USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Bradley Wayne Walker, #361377, Lexington County Detention Center, 521 Gibson Road, Lexington, SC 29072. (prou, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #9 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/9/2021.(prou, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 11/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/9/2021. (prou, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (prou, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Bradley Wayne Walker. Response to Motion due by 11/17/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose J Chavez, Lexington County Detention Center, Wellpath, filed by Bradley Wayne Walker. Service due by 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Bradley Walker, #2 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Lexington County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Wayne Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Jose J Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Practitioner Beth Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Bookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Novak (or Novac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt O Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?