Pilgrim's Pride Corporation v. Diaz et al
Petitioner: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Respondent: Michael Diaz, Jean-Nichole Diaz and Diaz Family Farms LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv04413
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Amy Yager Jenkins for July 10-14, 2023 (Jenkins, Amy)
January 9, 2023 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER vacating #19 Scheduling Order, #20 Mediation Order. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/9/2023. (cbru, )
January 6, 2023 Filing 22 Letter from Robert Wehrman and Amy Y. Jenkins. (Wehrman, Robert)
January 3, 2023 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/3/2023.(cbru, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 20 *Vacated* MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/3/2023. (cbru, ) Modified to edit text on 1/9/2023 (cbru, ).
January 3, 2023 Filing 19 *Vacated* CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 2/6/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/6/2023, Plaintiff ID of Expert Witness due by 4/3/2023, Defendant ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/3/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/3/2023, Discovery due by 7/3/2023, Motion in Limine due by 10/13/2023, Motions due by 7/17/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/2/2023, Bench Trial Deadline 11/3/2023, Mediation Due by 9/15/2023. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/3/2023. (cbru, ) Modified to edit text on 1/9/2023 (cbru, ).
January 3, 2023 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Michael Dallas Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Respondents. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/3/2023.(mdea )
December 29, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation to #7 Answer to Complaint. (Jenkins, Amy) Modified to edit linkage on 1/3/2023 (cbru, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Alison Meryl Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Respondents. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/29/2022.(mdea )
December 29, 2022 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for James Wesley Crooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Respondents. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/29/2022.(mdea )
December 28, 2022 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis. Judge Honorable Sherri A Lydon no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
December 28, 2022 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
December 27, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alison Newman ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10864505) by Jean-Nichole Diaz, Michael Diaz, Diaz Family Farms LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for PHV, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Duffy, Brian)
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10864484) by Jean-Nichole Diaz, Michael Diaz, Diaz Family Farms LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for PHV, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Duffy, Brian)
December 27, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jamie Crooks ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10864464) by Jean-Nichole Diaz, Michael Diaz, Diaz Family Farms LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for PHV, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Duffy, Brian)
December 22, 2022 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Diaz Family Farms LLC.(Wehrman, Robert)
December 22, 2022 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jean-Nichole Diaz, Michael Diaz.(Wehrman, Robert)
December 22, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Opposition to Petition to Vacate by Jean-Nichole Diaz, Michael Diaz, Diaz Family Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 4/7/2022 Letter from C. Bailey to AAA)(Wehrman, Robert) Modified to edit text on 1/3/2023 (cbru, ).
December 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lewis Wehrman on behalf of Jean-Nichole Diaz, Michael Diaz, Diaz Family Farms LLC (Wehrman, Robert)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clayton Edward Bailey (Filing fee $350 receipt number ASCDC-10837431) by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. Response to Motion due by 12/22/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit A - Court Admissions for Clayton E. Bailey, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Jenkins, Amy) Modified to edit text on 12/8/2022 (cbru, ).
December 7, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation.(cbru, )
December 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD as to Jean-Nichole Diaz, Michael Diaz, Diaz Family Farms LLC filed by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Broiler Production Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Arbitration Demand, #3 Exhibit C - Cover Letter Regarding Arbitration Demand, #4 Exhibit D - 2022.03.28 Pilgrim's Letter to AAA, #5 Exhibit E - 2022.05.18 Procedural Order Number 1, #6 Exhibit F - 2022.06.03 Pilgrim's Opposition to Class Arbitration Proceedings, #7 Exhibit G - 2022.07.01 Pilgrim's Reply re Opposition to Class Arbitration Proceedings, #8 Exhibit H - 2022.06.17 Diaz Submission in Favor of Class Arbitration, #9 Exhibit I - 2022.07.11 Procedural Order No. 2, #10 Exhibit J - 2022.07.29 Pilgrim's Supplemental Brief Per Procedural Order Number 2, #11 Exhibit K - 2022.07.29 Diaz Supplemental Authority Submission, #12 Exhibit L - 2022.10.06 Letter from Arbitrator regarding Additional Submissions, #13 Exhibit M - 2022.10.18 Pilgrim's Response to arbitration October 6th Letter, #14 Exhibit N - 2022.10.18 Diaz Supplemental Brief, #15 Exhibit O - 2022.11.07 Clause Construction Award)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Represented By: Amy Yager Jenkins
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Diaz
Represented By: Michael Dallas Lieberman
Represented By: Robert Lewis Wehrman
Represented By: Alison Meryl Newman
Represented By: Brian C Duffy
Represented By: James Wesley Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jean-Nichole Diaz
Represented By: Brian C Duffy
Represented By: Robert Lewis Wehrman
Represented By: Alison Meryl Newman
Represented By: James Wesley Crooks
Represented By: Michael Dallas Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diaz Family Farms LLC
Represented By: Robert Lewis Wehrman
Represented By: James Wesley Crooks
Represented By: Michael Dallas Lieberman
Represented By: Alison Meryl Newman
Represented By: Brian C Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?