Sullivan v. S.C. Dept. of Mental Health et al
Plaintiff: Charles T. Sullivan
Defendant: Wellpath Recovery Solutions, S.C. Dept. of Mental Health, Correct Care Recovery Solutions, Correct Care of South Carolina, Capt Tyrone Werts, Kelly Gothard and Elizabeth Hutto
Case Number: 5:2023cv01077
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Filing 23 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #21 Order on Motion for Leave to File w/NEF, Summons, and three USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Charles T. Sullivan, #1033-8426, DMH/Wellpath Recovery Solutions SVPTP, 4546 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC 29210. (prou, )
May 9, 2023 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against S.C. Dept. of Mental Health, Wellpath Recovery Solutions, Tyrone Werts, Kelly Gothard, Elizabeth Hutto, filed by Charles T. Sullivan. Service due by 8/7/2023.(prou, )
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, ECF No. #15 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to docket Plaintiff's proposed Amended Complaint, ECF No. #15 -1 as his Amended Complaint. Within 21 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff is directed to complete one summons form for each Defendant he has added as a Defendant in this case. Further, he must fully complete, sign, and return a Form USM-285 for Defendant Tyrone Werts, Kelly Gothard, Ph.D, and Elizabeth Hutto, Esq. Alternatively, should Defendant's counsel wish to accept service on behalf of any or all of these individuals, counsel may file the appropriate document within 21 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/9/2023.(prou, )
May 3, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by Wellpath Recovery Solutions.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/11/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Atkinson, Daniel)
May 3, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Response filed by S.C. Dept. of Mental Health.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/11/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Biltoft, Jacob)
April 26, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Quintin Atkinson on behalf of Wellpath Recovery Solutions (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Atkinson, Daniel)
April 19, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Charles T. Sullivan. Response to Motion due by 5/3/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
April 10, 2023 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 13 TEXT Order w/ (3)Civil Cover Sheets, (3)Summons, (3)USM-285s and AO-240, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Charles T. Sullivan, #1033-8426, DMH/Wellpath Recovery Solutions SVPTP, 4546 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC, 29210 (dsto, )
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: On April 7, 2023, Plaintiff filed what he styled as a letter, informing the court that he intended to file an Amended Complaint, and requesting the Clerk of Court send him several civil cover sheets, as well as three U.S. Marshal service forms. ECF No. #12 . The Clerk of Court is instructed to send Plaintiff the documents requested in the letter. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 04/10/2023. (dsto, )
April 7, 2023 Filing 12 Letter from Charles T. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #10 Scheduling Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Charles T. Sullivan, #1033-8426, DMH/Wellpath Recovery Solutions SVPTP, 4546 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC 29210. (prou, )
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/24/2023, Discovery due by 5/23/2023, Motions due by 7/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/24/2023. (prou, )
March 23, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by S.C. Dept. of Mental Health. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Biltoft, Jacob); Modified on 3/24/2023 to correct event type. (prou, )
March 21, 2023 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #7 Order to Notify of Address Change w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Charles T. Sullivan, #1033-8426, DMH/Wellpath Recovery Solutions SVPTP, 4546 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC, 29210 (dsto, )
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 03/21/2023. (dsto, )
March 20, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wellpath Recovery Solutions.(Gende, Mark) Modified 3/21/2023 to correct event code. (dsto, )
March 20, 2023 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Wellpath Recovery Solutions.(Gende, Mark) Modified on 3/21/2023 to remove attachment and file separately.(dsto, )
March 16, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by S.C. Dept. of Mental Health.(dsto, )
March 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023-CP-40-00431. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10997719), filed by S.C. Dept. of Mental Health. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Affidavit of Service)(dsto, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2023: #3 Notice of Removal Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service) (dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. S.C. Dept. of Mental Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath Recovery Solutions
Represented By: Michael Douglas Crump
Represented By: Daniel Quintin Atkinson
Represented By: Mark V Gende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.C. Dept. of Mental Health
Represented By: Jacob Alan Biltoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Recovery Solutions
Represented By: Daniel Quintin Atkinson
Represented By: Mark V Gende
Represented By: Michael Douglas Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care of South Carolina
Represented By: Mark V Gende
Represented By: Daniel Quintin Atkinson
Represented By: Michael Douglas Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Tyrone Werts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Gothard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hutto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?