Gerald v. NC Vital Records
Petitioner: Kathleen Gerald
Respondent: NC Vital Records
Case Number: 5:2023cv06043
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, 17 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #16 Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Kathleen Gerald, 2000 Wayside Dr, Loris, SC 29569. (prou, )
January 8, 2024 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends the district judge dismiss the petition in the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/8/2024. (prou, )
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #16 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/8/2024.(prou, )
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising petitioner to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/8/2024. (prou, )
January 5, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Kathleen Gerald. Response to Motion due by 1/19/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #8 Proper Form Order w/NEF, and Form AO 240, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Kathleen Gerald, 2000 Wayside Dr, Loris, SC 29569. (prou, )
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 12/21/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/30/2023. (prou, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (prou, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kathleen Gerald. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerald v. NC Vital Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kathleen Gerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NC Vital Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?