Reed v. Harvey
Petitioner: Lavern Justin Reed
Respondent: South Carolina, State of and Director Harvey
Case Number: 5:2024cv00409
Filed: January 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Joseph Dawson
2 Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 31 OBJECTION to #27 Report and Recommendation by Lavern Justin Reed. Reply to Objections due by 3/21/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, )
March 5, 2024 Filing 30 Letter from Lavern Justin Reed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )
February 27, 2024 Filing 28 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, #25 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer w/NEF, 26 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Lavern Justin Reed, #636656, Alvin S Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. (prou, )
February 27, 2024 Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends the court dismiss the Petition in the above-captioned case without prejudice and without requiring Respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 3/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/27/2024. (prou, )
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #25 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/27/2024.(prou, )
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(prou, )
February 16, 2024 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #21 Deficiency Memo w/NEF, #20 Letter, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Lavern Justin Reed, #636656, Alvin S Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. (prou, )
February 16, 2024 Filing 21 Deficiency Memo: Document #20, Letter. See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 2/28/2024. (prou, )
February 16, 2024 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 18 Case Reassigned, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Lavern Justin Reed, #636656, Alvin S Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. (prou, )
February 16, 2024 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Judge Jacquelyn D Austin. Judge Joseph Dawson, III no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
February 15, 2024 Filing 20 Letter from Lavern Justin Reed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )
February 14, 2024 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #14 Deficiency Memo w/NEF, original #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, original #12 Letter, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Lavern Justin Reed, #636656, Alvin S Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. (prou, )
February 14, 2024 Filing 14 Deficiency Memo: Document #11, Motion to Appoint Counsel, and Document #12, Letter. See attached Deficiency Memo. Any response due is based on the filing date of the original document. Docket Correction due 2/26/2024. (prou, )
February 14, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Lavern Justin Reed. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Transactions by Inmate Detail and Owed, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
February 14, 2024 Filing 12 Letter from Lavern Justin Reed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ). Modified on 2/22/2024 to replace with signed document provided by filer (prou, ).
February 14, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lavern Justin Reed. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West (prou, ). Modified on 2/22/2024 to replace with signed document provided by filer (prou, ).
February 2, 2024 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #8 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Form AO 240, 2241 Petition, and a 1983 packet, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Lavern Justin Reed, #636656, Alvin S Glenn Detention Center, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. (prou, )
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 2/23/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/1/2024. (prou, )
January 26, 2024 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (prou, )
January 26, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lavern Justin Reed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lavern Justin Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: South Carolina, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?