Frye v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, The et al
Plaintiff: Marion Wade Frye
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections, The, Director Bryan Sterling, Kenneth Nelson, Randy Ward, Franklin Milller, Contraband Correctional Officer DeGroff, Correctional Officer Maddox, Department of Mental Health/Behavioral Health Services, Sholanda Jackson, Mental Health Officer Hughes, Qualified Mental Health Personnel Thomas, Qualified Mental Health Personnel Fouty, Qualified Mental Health Personnel Tolsen, South Carolina Department of Medical Services, The, John Doe, Bruce Lobitz, Viola Thorton, Nurse Massey, Nurse Harris, South Carolina Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation State Board of Medical Examiners, The, Board Executive Jessica Beise, Food and Drug Administration, Health and Human Services, The, Commissioner, Director of Center for Device and Radiologic Health, Health and Human Services Office for Ciivil Rights Director, Director, Center for Device and Radiologic Health, Prisma Health Hospital, John Does 1-5, Image Care LLC, Office of Inspector General, South Carolina Department of Corrections Department of Mental Health/Behavior Health Services Office, The, South Carolina Department of Corrections Department of Medical Services Office, The, South Carolina Department of Corrections Department of Medical Services Director, The, Office of General Counsel, Prisma Health Hospital Sergeon, Servants, License Physicians, and Employees John Does 1 - 5 and Image Care LLC Radiologist, License Physicians, Employees, Servants, John Does 1 - 5
Case Number: 5:2024cv01893
Filed: April 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document #24 MOTION to Change Venue. First attachment description: Supporting Documents. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes)(prou, )
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marion Wade Frye. Response to Motion due by 6/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION for Copies at no expense ( Response to Motion due by 6/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Marion Wade Frye. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue by Marion Wade Frye. Response to Motion due by 6/17/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelopes)No proposed order. Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, ) Modified on 6/10/2024; see document #27 for additional attachments (prou, ).
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Protection Order by Marion Wade Frye. Response to Motion due by 6/17/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelopes)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter from Marion Wade Frye. (Attachments: #1 Proper Form NEF/Order and Notice with Handwritten Notes of the Plaintiff, #2 Certified Mail Receipt and SCDC Agreement to Debit E.H. Cooper Account dated 5-14-24, #3 Certified Mail Receipt and SCDC Agreement to Debit E.H. Cooper Account dated 5-15-24, #4 Envelope)(prou, )
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Change Venue by Marion Wade Frye. Response to Motion due by 6/3/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jessica Beise, Contraband Correctional Officer DeGroff, Qualified Mental Health Personnel Fouty, Nurse Harris, Mental Health Officer Hughes, Image Care LLC, Sholanda Jackson, Bruce Lobitz, Correctional Officer Maddox, Nurse Massey, Franklin Milller, Kenneth Nelson, Prisma Health Hospital, South Carolina Department of Corrections, The, South Carolina Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation State Board of Medical Examiners, The, Bryan Sterling, Qualified Mental Health Personnel Thomas, Viola Thorton, Qualified Mental Health Personnel Tolsen, Randy Ward, South Carolina Department of Corrections Department of Mental Health/Behavior Health Services Office, The, South Carolina Department of Corrections Department of Medical Services Office, The, South Carolina Department of Corrections Department of Medical Services Director, The, Office of General Counsel, Prisma Health Hospital Sergeon, Servants, License Physicians, and Employees John Does 1 - 5, Image Care LLC Radiologist, License Physicians, Employees, Servants, John Does 1 - 5, filed by Marion Wade Frye. Service due by 8/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Additional Amended Complaint, #2 SC Department of Corrections Inmate Grievance Form, #3 Envelope, #4 Envelope)(prou, )
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Assistance re #10 Proper Form Order and Notice, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Proper Form Order and Notice. ( Response to Motion due by 6/3/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Marion Wade Frye. (Attachments: #1 Restrictive Housing Placement Notification, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Copies at no expense by Marion Wade Frye. Response to Motion due by 6/3/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT REMAILED: #11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Marion Wade Frye, #375354, Tyger Correctional Institution, Unit 5B-116-A, 200 Prison Road, Enoree, SC 29335. (prou, )
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #11 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #10 Proper Form Order and Notice w/NEF, Complaint form, Summons, and USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Marion Wade Frye, #375354, Tyger Correctional Institution, Unit 5B-116-A, 200 Prison Road, Enoree, SC 29335. (prou, )
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff submitted a Financial Certificate for the District of South Carolina, which is construed as a Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ECF No. #2 . Plaintiff has paid the filing fee for his case. See ECF Nos. #1 and 8 . Accordingly Plaintiff's Motion, ECF No. #2 , is denied as moot. Because Plaintiff has paid to the court an amount greater than the filing fee in his case, the Clerk of Court is therefore directed to refund Plaintiff the amount of money he overpaid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/3/2024.(prou, ) (prou, ). Modified on 5/8/2024 to add document and to edit text (prou, ).
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER AND NOTICE: Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his Complaint by filing an amended complaint by May 17, 2024, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded that an amended complaint replaces the original Complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, the undersigned will conduct screening of the amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment. Case to be brought into proper form by 5/17/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/3/2024. (prou, )
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Marion Wade Frye from Marion Wade Frye, #375354, Broad River Correctional Institution, 4460 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC 29210 **TO** Marion Wade Frye, #375354, Tyger Correctional Institution, Unit 5B-116-A, 200 Prison Road, Enoree, SC 29335. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 300109922. (prou, )
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (prou, )
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Marion Wade Frye. Response to Motion due by 4/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jessica Beise, Commissioner, Contraband Correctional Officer DeGroff, Department of Mental Health/Behavioral Health Services, Director of Center for Device and Radiologic Health, Director, Center for Device and Radiologic Health, John Doe, John Does 1-5, John Does 1-5(Sergeon and Servants/Employees), Food and Drug Administration, Health and Human Services, The, Qualified Mental Health Personnel Fouty, Nurse Harris, Health and Human Services Office for Ciivil Rights Director, Mental Health Officer Hughes, Image Care LLC, Sholanda Jackson, Bruce Lobitz, Correctional Officer Maddox, Nurse Massey, Franklin Milller, Kenneth Nelson, Office of Inspector General, Prisma Health Hospital, South Carolina Department of Corrections, The, South Carolina Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation State Board of Medical Examiners, The, South Carolina Department of Medical Services, The, Bryan Sterling, Qualified Mental Health Personnel Thomas, Viola Thorton, Qualified Mental Health Personnel Tolsen, Randy Ward ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 300109835.), filed by Marion Wade Frye. Service due by 7/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frye v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Wade Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Bryan Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Milller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contraband Correctional Officer DeGroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Mental Health/Behavioral Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sholanda Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health Officer Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualified Mental Health Personnel Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualified Mental Health Personnel Fouty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualified Mental Health Personnel Tolsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Medical Services, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Lobitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viola Thorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation State Board of Medical Examiners, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board Executive Jessica Beise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food and Drug Administration, Health and Human Services, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Center for Device and Radiologic Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Human Services Office for Ciivil Rights Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Center for Device and Radiologic Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisma Health Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections Department of Mental Health/Behavior Health Services Office, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections Department of Medical Services Office, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections Department of Medical Services Director, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisma Health Hospital Sergeon, Servants, License Physicians, and Employees John Does 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image Care LLC Radiologist, License Physicians, Employees, Servants, John Does 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?