Emory Group LLC v. South By Sea LLC et al
Plaintiff: Emory Group LLC
Defendant: South By Sea LLC and Brandon Metcalf
Case Number: 6:2015cv01856
Filed: April 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Mary G Lewis
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the Plaintiff's Motion for Permanent Injunction is granted and this case is dismissed. (abuc)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 70 Motion for Confidentiality Order Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/19/2016.(abuc) (Main Document 71 replaced on 7/19/2016) (abuc, ).
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 2/29/2016.(abuc)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis in which Nexsen Pruet, LLC Appears. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 11/5/2014. (abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emory Group LLC v. South By Sea LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emory Group LLC
Represented By: Sara Centioni Kanos
Represented By: William Y Klett, III
Represented By: Timothy David St Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South By Sea LLC
Represented By: Robert Morton Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Metcalf
Represented By: Robert Morton Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?