Lipton v. Mclean et al

Plaintiff: Irwin J Lipton
Defendant: A Alexander Mclean, III, John L Calmes, Jr, Kelly M Malson, Mark C Roland, James R Gilreath, Charles D Way, Ken R Bramlett, Jr, Scott J Vassalluzzo, Darrell E Whitaker and World Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 6:2015cv02796
Filed: July 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Mary G Lewis
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 JUDGMENT / The Settling Parties are hereby directed to implement and consummate the Settlement according to the terms and provisions of the Stipulation. The Derivative Action and all claims contained therein, as well as all of the Released Claims , are dismissed on the merits and with prejudice. The Settling Parties are to bear their own costs, except as otherwise provided in the Stipulation and in this Judgment. The Court hereby approves the Fee and Expense Amount and Service Award in accordance with the Stipulation. (abuc)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Indicative Ruling Regarding Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/17/2017.(abuc)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the defendants' motions to dismiss are granted. Associated Cases: 6:15-cv-02796-MGL, 6:15-cv-03779-MGL(abuc)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting ( 9 in 6:15-cv-03779-MGL) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time [Revise Response and Briefing Schedule] filed by Mark C Roland, Kelly M Malson, John L Calmes, Jr, A Alexander McLean, III, World Acceptance Corporation, A Alexander Mclean, III. All deadlines as set out. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/2/2016. Associated Cases: 6:15-cv-02796-MGL, 6:15-cv-03779-MGL(abuc)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/14/2015.(abuc)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Darrell E Whitaker, Scott J Vassalluzzo, Charles D Way, James R Gilreath, Ken R Bramlett, Jr. All defendants' answers now due by October 16, 2015 and all other deadlines as set out. Signed by Honorable Mary G Lewis on 8/24/2015. (abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipton v. Mclean et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irwin J Lipton
Represented By: William E Hopkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Alexander Mclean, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Calmes, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly M Malson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark C Roland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Gilreath
Represented By: J David Black
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Represented By: Burl Franklin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D Way
Represented By: J David Black
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Represented By: Burl Franklin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken R Bramlett, Jr
Represented By: J David Black
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Represented By: Burl Franklin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J Vassalluzzo
Represented By: J David Black
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Represented By: Burl Franklin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell E Whitaker
Represented By: J David Black
Represented By: William W Wilkins
Represented By: Burl Franklin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?