Timpson et al v. Haley et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Timpson and Sandra Timpson
Defendant: Nikki Haley, Anderson County Disabilities and Special Needs Board, The, Horace Padgett, Dale Thompson, John King, South Carolina Department of Disabilities and Special Needs, The, William Danielson, Beverly Buscemi, South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, The, Christian Soura, Greenville County Disabilities and Special Needs Board, The and Unknown Actors
Case Number: 6:2016cv01174
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 OPINION and ORDER denying 386 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 386 Motion for New Trial as set out. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 2/4/20.(alew, )
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER denying 325 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/23/2019.(abuc)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 OPINION AND ORDER granting summary judgment for Defendant Haley. as to all claims purportedly made against her in her individual capacity. Defendant Haley's 133 MOTION for Clarification or, Alternatively, Other Relief, and Motion to Stay is found as moot. Further, the Court lifts the stay of its prior deadlines in this case and directs the parties to confer and provide the Court with a Final Amended Scheduling Order within ten days of this Order. Nikki Haley terminated. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/26/2018. (abuc)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 OPINION AND ORDER holding in abeyance 133 Motion for Clarification; granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion to Substitute Party consistent with this order. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/21/2018.(abuc)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 OPINION AND ORDER dismissing without prejudice 143 Motion for Attorney Fees; dismissing without prejudice 143 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b; denying as moot 146 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 147 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/23/2018.(abuc)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 OPINION AND ORDER denying 66 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Substitute Party; denying 82 Motion for Protective Order; holding in abeyance 105 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/24/2017.(abuc)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINION AND ORDER denying 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 2/14/2017.(abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timpson et al v. Haley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Timpson
Represented By: Robert C Childs, III
Represented By: Patricia L Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Timpson
Represented By: Robert C Childs, III
Represented By: Patricia L Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Haley
Represented By: James William Logan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson County Disabilities and Special Needs Board, The
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Represented By: William Joseph Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Padgett
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Represented By: William Joseph Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Thompson
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Represented By: William Joseph Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John King
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Represented By: William Joseph Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Disabilities and Special Needs, The
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Danielson
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Buscemi
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, The
Represented By: Damon C Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Soura
Represented By: Damon C Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville County Disabilities and Special Needs Board, The
Represented By: Knox L Haynsworth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Actors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?