Hendricks v. Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tallie E Hendricks
Defendant: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc, Equifax Information Services LLC and Merchants Credit Bureau Inc
Case Number: 6:2016cv02050
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice as to Merchants Credit Bureau Inc to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Merchants Credit Bureau Inc terminated. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/7/2017. (abuc)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice as to TransUnion LLC to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. TransUnion LLC terminated. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/5/2017. (abuc)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice as to Experian Information Solutions Inc to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Experian Information Solutions Inc terminated. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 5/31/2017. (abuc)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 54 Motion for Confidentiality Order Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/24/2017.(abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tallie E Hendricks
Represented By: Perry Buckner DeLoach, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Sims Radeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc
Represented By: Brian Montgomery Barnwell
Represented By: Allen Mattison Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Credit Bureau Inc
Represented By: Riley Augustus Bradham, II
Represented By: Maryann Elizabeth Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?