Perkins v. Tucker et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Perkins
Defendant: Glenda Tucker and Andrew Turner
Case Number: 6:2017cv01303
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Laurens
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2017 Filing 36 USCA MANDATE and ORDER as to #30 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas Perkins. The court dismisses this proceeding for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 45. (Attachments: #1 Order)(gpre, )
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER of USCA as to #30 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas Perkins. The court dismisses this proceeding for failure to prosecute pursuant to LocalRule 45. (gpre, )
October 25, 2017 Filing 33 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #31 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA and NEF, #30 Notice of Appeal and NEF, Docket Report, placed in U.S. Mail to Thomas Perkins (gpre, )
October 25, 2017 Filing 32 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #30 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (gpre, )
October 25, 2017 Filing 31 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #30 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (gpre, )
October 24, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #27 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, by Thomas Perkins. - The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, ) Modified on 10/25/2017 to edit text (gpre, ).
October 4, 2017 Filing 29 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #27 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, #28 Judgment placed in U.S. Mail to Thomas Perkins (gpre, )
October 4, 2017 Filing 28 JUDGMENT complaint dismissed without prejudice. (gpre, )
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopts #21 Report and incorporates it herein by reference. Therefore, Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal of the Magistrate (ECF No. 4)and Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 12) are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/4/2017. (gpre, )
July 14, 2017 Filing 24 OBJECTION to #21 Report and Recommendation by Thomas Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(abuc)
July 13, 2017 Filing 23 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Cover Letter. (Attachments: #1 Title to Real Estate, #2 Envelope)(abuc)
July 10, 2017 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Thomas Perkins, #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Perkins, #4 MOTION for Recusal filed by Thomas Perkins, #20 Order placed in U.S. Mail to Thomas Perkins. (abuc)
July 10, 2017 Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Thomas Perkins, #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Perkins, #4 MOTION for Recusal filed by Thomas Perkins. It is recommended that the District Court dismiss this action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. See Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 32425 (1989); Haines v. Kerner, 404 U.S. 519 (1972). It is further recommended that Plaintiff's pending motions for recusal of the Gray Court Magistrate Judge and for summary judgment should be denied or terminated as moot. Objections to R&R due by 7/24/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/10/2017. (abuc)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/10/2017. (abuc)
June 26, 2017 Filing 19 Letter re signatures from Thomas Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(abuc)
June 21, 2017 Filing 17 Letter from Thomas Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(abuc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2017: #2 Statement) (abuc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2017: #3 Summary of Court Summons, #4 Certified Mail Receipt) (abuc).
June 21, 2017 Filing 15 Additional Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(abuc)
June 19, 2017 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(abuc)
June 16, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Thomas Perkins. Response to Motion due by 6/30/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Envelope)Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(abuc)
June 13, 2017 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Proper Form Order, 1 Summons, 1 LR 26.01 form, 2 UMS-285 forms, and 1 copy of the last page of complaint placed in U.S. Mail to Thomas Perkins (abuc)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. (Case to be brought into proper form by 7/5/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/13/2017. (abuc) Modified to edit text on 6/15/2017 (abuc).
June 8, 2017 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document #4 MOTION for Recusal. First attachment description: Notice of filing Notice of Appeal-Gray Court Magistrate. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/12/2017: to replace with correct envelope) (kmca). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2017: #2 Signature Pages) (abuc, ).
May 30, 2017 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (gpre, )
May 25, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Recusal Gray Court Magistrate by Thomas Perkins. Response to Motion due by 6/8/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/6/2017) (gpre, ). Additional attachment #7 filed 6/8/2017 (gpre, ).
May 19, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Thomas Perkins. Response to Motion due by 6/2/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gray Court Magistrate Court, Laurens County Sheriff's Office, Glenda Tucker, Andrew Turner, filed by Thomas Perkins. Service due by 8/17/2017 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2017: #2 Signature Page, #3 Envelope) (abuc). Additional attachments filed as separate entry #23 on 7/13/2017 (abuc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Tucker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?