Federal Insurance Company v. Balanced Solutions et al

Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Austin Cathcart, Steven LeMarr, VitalMed RX LLC, Deborah Cathcart, Greenhill Pharmacy, William Scott, Christy LeMarr Oakes, Balanced Solutions, Tommy Martincic, Kristopher M Oakes and Gerald S LeMarr
Case Number: 6:2018cv01930
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 31 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William Scott.(kmca) Document removed from #30 Motion and filed separately by clerk. (kmca) Modified on 9/7/18: to add case number to document. (kmca)
September 7, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by William Scott. Response to Motion due by 9/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, # 2 LR 26.01 Answers)No proposed order.(Jolley, Kelly) (Main Document 30 and Attachment 1 replaced on 9/7/2018: to add case number). Modified on 9/7/2018: Attachment 2 removed and filed separately as document #31 . (kmca).
September 7, 2018 Filing 28 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Greenhill Pharmacy, Tommy Martincic.(kmca) Attachment removed from #27 Answer and filed separately by clerk. (kmca)
September 7, 2018 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Greenhill Pharmacy, Tommy Martincic. (Attachments: # 1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Bach, Adam) Modified on 9/7/2018: to remove attachment and file separately as document #28 (kmca).
September 6, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Austin Cathcart.(Salvini, Jessica)
September 6, 2018 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Austin Cathcart.(Salvini, Jessica)
September 5, 2018 Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian D Harrison added for Plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 9/5/18.(kmca)
September 5, 2018 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Deborah Cathcart.(Eppes, Frank)
September 5, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Deborah Cathcart.(Eppes, Frank)
September 4, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian D. Harrison, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7979077) by Federal Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 9/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application to appear pro hac vice - Brian Harrison, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Barker, Rita)
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. VitalMed RX LLC served on 8/18/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on VITALMED RX, LLC)(Barker, Rita)
September 4, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Gerald S LeMarr served on 8/18/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Gerald Lemarr)(Barker, Rita)
August 21, 2018 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Austin Cathcart answer due 9/6/2018. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/21/18.(kmca)
August 21, 2018 Filing 16 First Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Summons Issued,, until September 6, 2018 by Austin Cathcart. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Salvini, Jessica) Modified on 8/21/2018: to add "consent" (kmca).
August 15, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David M Rhodes added for Plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/15/18.(kmca)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Rhodes ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7944071) by Federal Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/29/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application of Pro Hac Vice Admission of David M. Rhodes, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for David M. Rhodes, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David M. Rhodes)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Barker, Rita)
August 14, 2018 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Deborah Cathcart answer due 9/7/2018. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 8/14/18.(kmca)
August 14, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Deborah Cathcart. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Eppes, Frank)
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Tommy Martincic served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Barker, Rita)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Greenhill Pharmacy served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Barker, Rita)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Balanced Solutions served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Barker, Rita)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Austin Cathcart served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Barker, Rita)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. William Scott served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Barker, Rita)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Deborah Cathcart served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Barker, Rita)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Balanced Solutions, Austin Cathcart, Deborah Cathcart, Greenhill Pharmacy, Gerald S LeMarr, Steven LeMarr, Tommy Martincic, Christy LeMarr Oakes, Kristopher M Oakes, William Scott, VitalMed RX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Austin Cathcart, #2 Summons Deborah Cathcart, #3 Summons Kristopher Oakes, #4 Summons Christy Oakes, #5 Summons William Scott, #6 Summons VitalMed RX, #7 Summons Gerald LeMarr, #8 Summons Steven Lemarr, #9 Summons Greenhill Pharmacy, #10 Summons Tommy Martincic)(kmca)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Federal Insurance Company.(kmca)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Balanced Solutions, Austin Cathcart, Deborah Cathcart, Greenhill Pharmacy, Gerald S LeMarr, Steven LeMarr, Tommy Martincic, Christy LeMarr Oakes, Kristopher M Oakes, William Scott, VitalMed RX LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7887261), filed by Federal Insurance Company. Service due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment Letter & Check, #2 Exhibit B- Assignment Agreement)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Balanced Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Cathcart
Represented By: Jessica Salvini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven LeMarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VitalMed RX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Cathcart
Represented By: Frank Langston Eppes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenhill Pharmacy
Represented By: Robert Hudson Smith
Represented By: Adam Crittenden Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scott
Represented By: Ariail Burnside Kirk
Represented By: Kelly M Jolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy LeMarr Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balanced Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Martincic
Represented By: Robert Hudson Smith
Represented By: Adam Crittenden Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher M Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald S LeMarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Represented By: David Michael Rhodes
Represented By: Brian David Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?