Zipit Wireless Inc v. LG Electronics Inc
Plaintiff: Zipit Wireless Inc
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc
Case Number: 6:2018cv02016
Filed: July 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended up to and including February 18, 2020. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/25/19.(alew, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 71 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Zipit Wireless Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Foster, Robert) (Main Document 71 replaced on 11/25/2019) (alew, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (alew, ). Modified on 11/25/2019 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user, to add proposed order noted in main document (alew, ).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Confidentiality Order; Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/19/19.(alew, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 69 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order Jurisdictional Discovery only by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Redline version, #2 Exhibit B-Clean version)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Munson, Keith)
November 4, 2019 Filing 67 TEXT ORDER granting #66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Robert Unikel, Robert Laurenzi and Michelle Figueirdo for the defendant. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/4/19.(alew, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unikel, Laureni & Figueirdo) by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Munson, Keith)
October 30, 2019 Filing 65 TEXT ORDER granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Asim Bhansali, Kate Lazarus and Michael Kwun for the defendant. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/30/19.(alew, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Kwun ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8749837) by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Kwun Pro Hac Vice Application & Certificate)No proposed order.(Munson, Keith)
October 30, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kate E. Lazarus ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8749832) by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Lazarus Pro Hac Vice Application & Certificate)No proposed order.(Munson, Keith)
October 30, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asim M. Bhansali ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8749809) by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Bhansali Pro Hac Vice Application & Certificate)No proposed order.(Munson, Keith)
October 25, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Hearing on Motions held on June 20, 2019, at 9:34 a.m., before Judge J. Michelle Childs. Court Reporter Carly Horenkamp, RDR, CRR, CRC, Telephone number/E-mail carleen_horenkamp@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Redaction Request due 11/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2020. (chor, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 60 TEXT ORDER: In the instant patent infringement action, this matter is before the court pursuant to Defendant LG Electronics, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (ECF No. #42 .) In support of its Motion, Defendant generally asserts that it is a South Korean corporation with no jurisdictional contacts with South Carolina related to the accused devices. (ECF No. #42 -1 at 11.) In opposing Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, Plaintiff argues that Defendant has minimum contacts with South Carolina pursuant to the stream-of-commerce theory, which presupposes that the forum State does not exceed its powers under the Due Process Clause if it asserts personal jurisdiction over a corporation that delivers its products into the stream of commerce with the expectation that they will be purchased by consumers in the forum State. (ECF No. #44 at 16 (quoting Beverly Hills Fan Co. v. Royal Sovereign Corp., 21 F.3d 1558, 1566 (Fed. Cir. 1994)). Additionally, in lieu of granting Defendants Motion, Plaintiff requests that the court grant time for jurisdictional discovery which would allow [Plaintiff] Zipit to build on [Defendant] LGEKRs jurisdictional admissions..., as well as to develop further information supporting its jurisdictional allegations, including, for example, additional information relating to the number of Accused Products sold in this District, the ongoing nature of such sales, the precise retailers and distributors in this District selling the Accused Products, and [Defendant] LGEKRs knowledge that its Accused Products were being distributed nationwide, including in this District. (ECF No. #44 at 40.) In ruling on a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, the court may consider evidence outside of the pleadings, such as affidavits and other evidentiary materials, without converting the motion to dismiss into a motion for summary judgment. Richmond, Fredericksburg & Potomac R.R. Co. v. United States, 945 F.2d 765, 768 (4th Cir. 1991) (citing Adams v. Bain, 697 F.2d 1213, 1219 (4th Cir. 1982)); Magic Toyota, Inc. v. Se. Toyota Distribs., Inc., 784 F. Supp. 306, 310 (D.S.C. 1992). Moreover, the court has the discretion to grant jurisdictional discovery where pertinent facts bearing on the question of jurisdiction are controverted or where a more satisfactory showing of the facts is necessary. Boschetto v. Hansing, 539 F.3d 1011, 1020 (9th Cir. 2008). Therefore, based on the relevant case law and the current record, to include the parties contentious dispute regarding application of the stream-of-commerce theory to the instant Motion, the court GRANTS Plaintiffs Request for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery (ECF No. #44 at 40) and will allow the parties ninety (90) days of discovery on issues relevant to the courts personal jurisdiction over Defendant. Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (ECF No. #42 ) is DENIED without prejudice with leave to re-file after December 18, 2019. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/19/19.(alew, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 59 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court pursuant to Plaintiff Zipit Wireless, Inc.s Motion to Strike or, Alternatively, File a Sur-Reply Responding to New Arguments Contained in Defendant LG Electronics, Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue. (ECF No. #49 .) In its Motion, Plaintiff contends that Defendant violated Local Civil Rule 7.07 (D.S.C.) by presenting new arguments in its Reply (ECF No. #46 ) that should have been presented in its opening brief (ECF No. #42 -1) such that the court should either strike those new arguments or afford Plaintiff the opportunity to respond with a sur-reply. (ECF No. #49 at 6.) Defendant opposes the instant Motion asserting that the court should deny both of Plaintiffs requests because they are nothing more than an improper attempt by [Plaintiff] Zipit to have the last word. (ECF No. #51 at 1.) Upon its review, the court observes that the text of Local Rule 7.07 supports Defendants argument that [t]he Court-mandated three-brief schedule is intended to allow the movant to make its overarching argument(s) on a particular point of law or fact and then to reply to any specific arguments raised or emphasized by the non-movant in its opposition brief that is what a reply is for. (ECF No. #51 at 2 (citations omitted)); see Local Civ. Rule 7.07 (D.S.C.) (observing that replies although discouraged are for purposes of replying to matters raised initially in a response to a motion); AAR, Inc. v. Nunez, 408 F. Appx 828, 830 (5th Cir. 2011) (Generally, and for obvious reasons, a reply brief is limited to addressing matters presented by appellants opening brief and by appellees response brief, and is not the appropriate vehicle for presenting new arguments or legal theories to the court. (citation omitted)). However, even though the parties dispute how much new argument is in the Reply, the amount does not matter because [w]hen a reply brief presents new legal arguments or evidence, a court may take either of two courses of action: (a) refrain from relying on the new arguments or materials in the reply or (b) permit a surreply. Dalton v. Town of Silver City, Case No. 2:17-cv-01143-WJ-GJF, 2019 WL 1437164, at *6 (D.N.M. Apr. 1, 2019) (citing Beaird v. Seagate Tech., Inc., 145 F.3d 1159, 1164 (10th Cir. 2003)). Therefore, based on the foregoing, the court in its discretion DENIES Plaintiffs Motion to Strike (ECF No. #49 ) and GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion to File a Sur-Reply (id.). See Beaird, 145 F.3d at 1164 (observing that it is within the courts discretion to either permit a sur-reply or refrain from relying on any new material in a reply brief). Accordingly, the court will consider Plaintiffs Sur-Reply (ECF No. #49 -1) as it relates to Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue (ECF No. #42 ). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/18/19.(alew, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 58 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable J Michelle Childs: taking under advisement #42 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Motion to Transfer Case; taking under advisement #49 Motion to Strike; Motion for Leave to File; Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2019. Court Reporter Carly Horenkamp. (mbro, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Motion Hearing, 6/11/2019 @ 11:00 Greenville #1 Clement F Haynsworth Fed Bldg, 300 E Washingto St cancelled and rescheduled to: Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 09:30 AM in Columbia # 3, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable J Michelle Childs. (alew, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #49 MOTION to Strike #46 Reply to Response to Motion, MOTION for Leave to File, #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California MOTION to Transfer Case : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 6/11/2019 11:00 AM in Greenville #1, Clement F Haynsworth Fed Bldg, 300 E Washington St, Greenville before Honorable J Michelle Childs. (alew, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 55 SECOND NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Zipit Wireless Inc to #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A AU Optronics v. Vista Peak)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 2/22/2019 to edit text (alew, ).
January 25, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Zipit Wireless Inc to #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Court Decision)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 1/25/2019 to edit text (alew, ).
January 22, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION to Strike #46 Reply to Response to Motion, MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by Zipit Wireless Inc. (Foster, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Strike #46 Reply to Response to Motion, MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by LG Electronics Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/22/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Munson, Keith)
January 3, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith D Munson on behalf of LG Electronics Inc (Munson, Keith)
December 31, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION to Strike #46 Reply to Response to Motion, by Zipit Wireless Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Surreply)No proposed order.(Foster, Robert). Added MOTION for Leave to File Surreply on 1/2/2019; modified to add motion relief (alew, ).
December 27, 2018 Filing 48 TEXT ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/27/2018.(asni, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cortney Alexander, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8178864) by Zipit Wireless Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application - Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - GA Supreme Court)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Foster, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California MOTION to Transfer Case Response filed by LG Electronics Inc. (Clinkscale, Brent)
December 14, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California MOTION to Transfer Case Response filed by Zipit Wireless Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/21/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Declaration of Steve Risley, #2 Exhibit A-Greer Declaration with Cover Page, #3 Exhibit B-Heredia Declaration with Cover Page, #4 Exhibit C-Patterson Declaration with Cover Page, #5 Exhibit D-Hughes Declaration with Cover Page, #6 Exhibit E-LGEKR TM Registrations with Cover Page, #7 Exhibit F-Excerpts from LG G5 User Manual with Cover Page, #8 Exhibit G-NBC Atlanta Article re Google Atlanta with Cover Page, #9 Exhibit H-GEUS and LGEMU SC Business Registrations with Cover Page, #10 Exhibit I-Excerpts from Verizon LG G5 User Guide with Cover Page, #11 Exhibit J-DB Hoover's Profile for LGEMU, #12 Exhibit K-SCRA About Us Page, #13 Exhibit L-Venture South's Upstate Carolina Angel Network Page with Cover Page, #14 Exhibit M-Magna Mirrors with Cover Page, #15 Exhibit N-Genentech with Cover Page)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 12/17/2018: to remove duplicate text (Exhibit Ex) (kmca).
November 30, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Ryu Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Durbin Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Unikel Declaration Part 1 of 3, #5 Exhibit C - Unikel Declaration Part 2 of 3, #6 Exhibit C - Unikel Declaration Part 3 of 3)No proposed order.(Clinkscale, Brent). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 11/30/2018; modified to add motion relief (alew, ). Modified on 1/29/2019; see #54 Notice of Supplemental Authority (alew, ).
November 16, 2018 Filing 41 TEXT ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Laurenzi, Robert Unikel and Michelle K. Marek Figueiredo for the defendant. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/16/18.(alew, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michelle K. Marek Figueiredo ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8112136) by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Clinkscale, Brent) Modified on 11/16/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
November 16, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert W. Unikel ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8112052) by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Clinkscale, Brent) Modified on 11/16/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
November 16, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert R. Laurenzi ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8111917) by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Clinkscale, Brent) Modified on 11/16/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
October 2, 2018 Filing 37 TEXT ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. LG Electronics Inc answer due 11/30/2018. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/2/18.(alew, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LG Electronics Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Email with Plt's consent to extension)No proposed order.(Clinkscale, Brent)
September 18, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zipit Wireless Inc. LG Electronics Inc served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Foster, Robert) (Main Document 35 replaced on 9/20/2018) (alew, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #1 Affidavit of Service re: LG Electronics Inc) (alew, ). Modified on 9/20/2018 to add corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ).
August 29, 2018 Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Kent for plaintiff Zipit Wireless Inc. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/29/18.(alew, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Risley for plaintiff Zipit Wireless Inc. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/29/18.(alew, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Kent ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7971118) by Zipit Wireless Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application - Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Ga Supreme Court)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Foster, Robert)
August 21, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen R. Risley ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7956771) by Zipit Wireless Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application - Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Foster, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/29/2018) (alew, ). Modified on 8/29/2018 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user(alew, ).
August 13, 2018 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to LG Electronics, Inc. on 7/29/18 by Zipit Wireless Inc. Waiver of Service due by 9/28/2018. (Foster, Robert)
July 25, 2018 Filing 28 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit W pages 154-347 870 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit W pages 154-347 870 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit W pages 1-153 870 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit W pages 1-153 870 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text(alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 26 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit V - pages 56-126 837 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit V - pages 56 - 126 837 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 25 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit V - pages 1-55 837 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhbit V - pages 1-55 837 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text(alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 24 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit U - Notice Letter . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U - Notice U)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 23 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit T - LG Patent citing 870 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T - LG Patent citing 870)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to edit text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 22 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit Q-LG Emojis Pre-2017 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q-LG Emojis Pre-2017, #2 Exhibit R - LG Emojis 2017 - after, #3 Exhibit S-How to use keys)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to edit text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 21 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit P - pages 301-400 837 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P - pages 301-400 837 Claim Charts, #2 Exhibit P - pages 401-455 837 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 20 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit P - pages 201 -300 837 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P pages 201-300 837 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text(alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 19 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit P - pages 101-200 837 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P pages 101 -200 837 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 18 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit P pages 1-100 837 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P pages 1-100 837 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 17 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit O-pages 401-458 870 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - pages 401-458 870 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text(alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 16 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit O-pages 301 - 400 870 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O-pages 301 - 400 870 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text(alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit O-pages 201-300 870 Claim Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - pages 201 - 300870 Claim Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text(alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 14 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit O-pages 101-200 870 Claims Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O pages 101-200 870 Claims Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text(alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 13 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit O-pages 1-100 870 Claims Charts . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - pages 1-100-870 Claims Charts)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit L - EP Patent . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L - EP Patent, #2 Exhibit M - JP Patent, #3 Exhibit N - Aus Patent)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 11 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit H - 837 Patent . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - 837 Patent, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I - 837 File History, #3 Exhibit J - 837 IPR Preliminary Response, #4 Exhibit K - 837 Final Decision)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 10 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit G-pages 160-329 Awards, Articles, Media . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G-pages 160-329 Awards, Articles, Media)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit G - pages 1-159 Awards, Articles, Media . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - pages 1-159 Awards, Articles, Media)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit F - 870 Final Decision . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - 870 Final Decision)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit D - Provisional Application . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Provisional Application, #2 Exhibit E - 870 IPR Preliminary Response)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 25, 2018 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit A - 870 Patent . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 870 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - 870 File History, #3 Exhibit C - 870 Certificate of Correction)(Foster, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2018 to remove duplicate text (alew, ).
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (alew, )
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics Inc. (alew, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Zipit Wireless Inc.(alew, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG Electronics Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7901921.), filed by Zipit Wireless Inc. Service due by 10/22/2018(alew, ) Modified on 7/31/2018: See #6 #7 #8 #9 #10 #11 #12 #13 #14 #15 #16 #17 #18 #19 #20 #21 #22 #23 #24 #25 #26 #27 #28 additional attachments (kmca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zipit Wireless Inc v. LG Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc
Represented By: Asim M Bhansali
Represented By: Robert W Unikel
Represented By: Robert R Laurenzi
Represented By: Kate E Lazarus
Represented By: Michelle K Marek Figueiredo
Represented By: Michael S Kwun
Represented By: Brent OE Clinkscale
Represented By: Keith D Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zipit Wireless Inc
Represented By: Robert P Foster
Represented By: Daniel A Kent
Represented By: Stephen Robert Risley
Represented By: Cortney Scott Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?