United States of America v. 20500 dollars in US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 20500 dollars in US Currency
Case Number: 6:2018cv02084
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/6/18. (sfla)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report by United States of America.(Sherard, Carrie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 CLAIM Forfeiture Action in Rem (Supplmental Rule G(5)(a) ) by 20500 dollars in US Currency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification)(Kappel, Matthew)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/10/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/24/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 9/24/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/18/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/19/2019, Discovery due by 3/21/2019, Motion in Limine due by 6/4/2019, Motions due by 4/4/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/17/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/11/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 6/18/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/21/18. (sfla)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 20500 dollars in US Currency.(Kappel, Matthew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Kappel on behalf of 20500 dollars in US Currency (Kappel, Matthew)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $20,500 in U.S. Currency. (Sherard, Carrie)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (sfla)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (sfla)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against 20500 dollars in US Currency filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Verification)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 20500 dollars in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20500 dollars in US Currency
Represented By: Matthew J Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?